California Northern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth D Laporte
Case #: 3:15-cv-01159
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2015
Terminated:Sep 15, 2015
Last checked: Monday Sep 07, 2015 7:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Lyft, Inc.
Represented By
Albert Quoc Giang
Caldwell Leslie & Proctor, PC
contact info
Cameron Johnson
Caldwell Leslie And Proctor, PC
contact info
Christopher G. Caldwell
Caldwell Leslie & Proctor, Pc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Casey Loewen
Represented By
Daniel A. Carpio
Dunn & Associates
contact info
R. Rex Parris
R Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
Alexander Russell Wheeler
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
John Michael Bickford
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
Michael B. Turner
Dunn & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Wright
Represented By
Daniel A. Carpio
Dunn & Associates
contact info
R. Rex Parris
R Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
Alexander Russell Wheeler
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
John Michael Bickford
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
Michael B. Turner
Dunn & Associates
contact info

GPO Sep 15 2015
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 34 Motion ; granting 14 Motion to Compel; denying 27 Motion to Strike (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)

1. Lawsuit says Lyft cheated new drivers out of $1,000 bonuses (mercurynews.com)
Submitted Mon 03/16/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 28, 2016
47 47 appeal Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate Thu 01/28 10:40 AM
CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re46 USCA Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
Related: [-]
46 46 appeal USCA Order Thu 01/28 10:37 AM
ORDER of USCA Pursuant to the parties' stipulated motion, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. FOR THE COURT; as to38 Notice of Appeal, filed by Casey Loewen, Jonathan Wright (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
45 45 misc Transcript Tue 11/17 4:36 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 9, 2015, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
Related: [-] 43 Transcript Order (s)43
Monday, November 16, 2015
44 44 misc Transcript Mon 11/16 10:14 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 9:28-10:02 held on 7/7/15, before Judge Elizabeth D. LaPorte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jill R. Bryce/Bryce Reporting Services, telephone number (510)828-9404, Email: Info@brycereporting.com. Tape Number: FTR 9:28-10:02. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
Related: [-] 41 Transcript Order (s)41
Wednesday, October 28, 2015
43 43 misc Transcript Order Wed 10/28 12:32 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Casey Loewen, Jonathan Wright for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bickford, John) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
Related: [-]
42 42 appeal Transcript Designation Form Wed 10/28 12:28 PM
Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on June 9, 2015 before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, (Bickford, John) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
41 41 misc Transcript Order Tue 10/20 12:38 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Casey Loewen, Jonathan Wright for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bickford, John) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
Related: [-]
40 40 appeal Transcript Designation Form Tue 10/20 12:21 PM
Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on July 7, 2015 before Judge Elizabeth D Laporte, re38 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 11/20/2015. (Bickford, John) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
39 39 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 09/23 1:46 PM
USCA Case Number 15-16878 for38 Notice of Appeal, filed by Casey Loewen, Jonathan Wright. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
38 38 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 09/21 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Casey Loewen, Jonathan Wright. Appeal of Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Strike37 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9852144 paid.) (Bickford, John) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
37 37 26 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Strike Tue 09/15 2:36 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 34 Motion ; granting 14 Motion to Compel; denying 27 Motion to Strike (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2015
36 36 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 08/18 3:50 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 9/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The Case Management Statement is now due by 9/22/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
35 35 oth_sup Statement of Recent Decision Wed 08/05 8:52 AM
STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION filed byLyft, Inc.. Related [+] (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
Related: [-] 34
34 34 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/05 8:51 AM
MOTION TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 7-3(d) AND 7-11, TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION filed by Lyft, Inc.. Responses due by 8/19/2015. Replies due by 8/26/2015.(Giang, Albert) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
33 33 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Tue 07/14 4:34 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re32 Opposition/Response to Motion, DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF LYFT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS ACTION filed byLyft, Inc.. Related [+] (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
Related: [-] 32
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
32 32 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 07/14 4:31 PM
RESPONSE Related [+] DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO LYFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS ACTION filed byLyft, Inc.. (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
Related: [-] 27 MOTION to Strike26 Reply to Opposition/Response, DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENFORCE LOCAL RULE 7-3(D) AND STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' UNAUTHORIZED SUR-REPLY
Tuesday, July 07, 2015
31 31 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 07/07 12:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/7/2015 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding Defendant's motion to compel arbitration 14 . The Court takes the motion under submission. Defendant to file a response to the sur-reply of no more than five pages by 7/14/2015. FTR Time: 9:28 - 10:02 Plaintiff Attorney: John Bickford Defendant Attorneys: Albert Giang and Michael Roth This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2015
30 30 order Order on Stipulation Mon 07/06 4:46 PM
ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 29 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
29 29 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 07/02 5:14 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Lyft, Inc..(Johnson, Cameron) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference
28 28 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Thu 07/02 11:14 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Casey Loewen, Jonathan Wright (Bickford, John) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
27 27 motion Strike Wed 07/01 9:28 AM
MOTION to Strike26 Reply to Opposition/Response, DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENFORCE LOCAL RULE 7-3(D) AND STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' UNAUTHORIZED SUR-REPLY filed by Lyft, Inc.. Responses due by 7/15/2015. Replies due by 7/22/2015.(Giang, Albert) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENFORCE LOCAL RULE 7-3(D) AND STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S UNAUTHORIZED SUR-REPLY
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
26 26 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 06/30 4:23 PM
REPLY Related [+] Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition filed byCasey Loewen, Jonathan Wright.(Bickford, John) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action
Att: 1 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Sur-Reply
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
25 25 21 pgs respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 06/23 6:02 PM
REPLY Related [+] REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LYFT INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS ACTION filed byLyft, Inc.. (Caldwell, Christopher) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
24 24 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 06/16 11:34 PM
RESPONSE Related [+] Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action filed byCasey Loewen, Jonathan Wright.(Bickford, John) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action
Att: 1 Declaration of John M. Bickford,
Att: 2 Declaration of Casey Loewen,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jonathan Wright,
Att: 4 Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice
Friday, June 12, 2015
23 23 order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 06/12 2:11 PM
ORDER Denying Motion to Compel Discovery by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: denying 19 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
22 22 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 06/09 11:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 6/9/15 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding Plaintiffs' motion to compel 19 . The motion is denied. Court Reporter Name: Belle Ball Plaintiff Attorney: John Bickford Defendant Attorneys: Michael Roth and Albert Giang This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/9/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2015
21 21 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 05/19 3:56 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 05/19 3:54 PM
RESPONSE Related [+] OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL LIMITED DISCOVERY ON THE ENFORCEABILITY OF DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.'S ARBITRATION AGREEMENTS filed byLyft, Inc..(Giang, Albert) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
Related: [-] 19 MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery on the Enforceability of Lyft's Arbitration Agreements
Att: 1 Declaration of Cameron J. Johnson in Support of Lyft, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Limited Discovery on the Enforceability of Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Arbitration Agreeements,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
19 19 10 pgs motion Compel Tue 05/12 6:29 PM
MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery on the Enforceability of Lyft's Arbitration Agreements filed by Casey Loewen. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 5/19/2015.(Bickford, John) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of John M. Bickford,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, May 01, 2015
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/01 8:32 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Case Management Conference and the hearing for the motion to compel arbitration14 are rescheduled to 7/7/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2015
18 18 order Order on Stipulation Thu 04/30 4:35 PM
ORDER (1) Staying Discovery; (2) Vacating the Parties' Deadline to Complete Their Rule 26(F) Conference; (3) Setting Briefing Schedule and Shortening Time for a Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery; (4) Modifying the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Lyft, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration; and (5) Continuing Initial Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified 17 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 04/29 10:59 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SEEKING ORDER: (1) STAYING DISCOVERY; (2) VACATING THE PARTIES DEADLINE TO COMPLETE THEIR RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE; (3) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND SHORTENING TIME FOR A HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; (4) MODIFYING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR LYFT, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; AND (5) CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Lyft, Inc..(Johnson, Cameron) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 17, 2015
16 16 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 04/17 6:17 PM
Declaration of Eric Burdullis in Support of14 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action filed byLyft, Inc.. Related [+] (Caldwell, Christopher) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 04/17 6:15 PM
Declaration of Sebastian Brannstrom in Support of14 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action filed byLyft, Inc.. Related [+] (Caldwell, Christopher) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
14 14 29 pgs motion Compel Fri 04/17 6:13 PM
MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action filed by Lyft, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/8/2015.(Caldwell, Christopher) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Fri 04/17 5:05 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Lyft, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Rakuten, Inc. for Lyft, Inc.. (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 04/10 3:48 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lyft, Inc... (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2015
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 03/30 9:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Defendant Lyft, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this Notice. The consent/declination forms are attached to this Notice and are also located on the Court's home page, www.cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
10 10 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 03/27 2:45 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT LYFT, INC'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/27 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Quoc Giang (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/27 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Caldwell (Caldwell, Christopher) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2015
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/25 5:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Casey Loewen, Jonathan Wright.. (Bickford, John) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/23 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Loewen. All Defendants.(Bickford, John) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, March 12, 2015
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 03/12 12:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Lyft, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 03/12 12:31 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2015 10:00 AM.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 03/12 11:32 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 03/11 4:42 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bickford, John) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/11 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9352673.). Filed byCasey Loewen, Jonathan Wright.(Bickford, John) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet