New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Referred: James L Cott
Case #: 1:15-cv-01826
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ag Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2015
Terminated:Nov 17, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 08, 2015 8:30 AM EDT
Defendant
American International Group, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick William Shea
Paul Hastings Llp (ny)
contact info
Kelsey Gottschalk Van Wart
Paul Hastings Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
United Guaranty Corporation
Represented By
Patrick William Shea
Paul Hastings Llp (ny)
contact info
Kelsey Gottschalk Van Wart
Paul Hastings Llp (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheryl Medeiros
Represented By
Milton L. Williams, Jr
Vladeck, Raskin & Clark, P.C.
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
28 28 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/17 12:03 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, fees and expenses. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/17/2015) (kgo)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Transcript Deadlines Tue 11/17 12:04 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (kgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
27 27 misc Status Report Mon 08/31 2:14 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation.(Shea, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2015
26 26 order Stipulation and Order Mon 08/24 12:08 PM
STIPULATED NON-WAIVER AGREEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The disclosure by a producing Party of documents or information that such Party believes is subject to a claim of privilege, including but not limited to attorney-client privilege or the work product doctrine, regardless of whether the information was so designated at the time of disclosure, shall not be deemed a waiver, in whole or in part, of a Party's claim of privilege with respect to such privileged documents, or generally of such privilege, as to third parties or in any other federal or state proceeding or investigation of any kind. This provision also extends to preserve the attorney-client privilege or the work product doctrine for any third party client confidences relevant to this proceeding that may be disclosed, inadvertent or otherwise. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 8/24/2015) (kgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
25 25 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 07/14 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Pre-Trial Conference proceeding held on 06/30/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Transcript Tue 07/14 11:19 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Initial Pre-Trial Conference held on 6/30/2015 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2015.(ca) (Main Document 24 replaced on 7/14/2015) (ca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
23 23 order Protective Order Tue 06/30 4:09 PM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 6/30/2015) (kgo)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/30 4:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties propose the following schedule herein. The Court proposed, and counsel for both sides agreed, that Plaintiff will be given 70 hours to depose 12 witnesses (the 13th witness being one the parties have a mutual interest in deposing). The Court will hold a status conference on December 15 @ 10 AM to chart the further course of the case at that time. All dates listed below are subject to change. The fact discovery deadline of December 11, 2015 will not be extended. (As further set forth in this Order.) Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 7/30/2015. Deposition due by 12/11/2015. Fact Discovery due by 12/11/2015. Expert Discovery due by 2/9/2016. Status Conference set for 12/15/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 6/30/2015) (kgo) Modified on 6/30/2015 (kgo)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 06/30 4:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/30/2015. (Tam, David)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 06/30 4:30 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/15/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (kgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 06/23 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Milton L. Williams, Jr on behalf of Sheryl Medeiros. New Address: Vladeck, Raskin & Clark, P.C., 565 Fifth Avenue, 9th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10017, 2124037300. (Williams, Milton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2015
20 20 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 06/11 2:06 PM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference Initial Conference set for 6/30/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 06/11 12:12 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Patrick W. Shea dated June 11, 2015. Document filed by American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation.(Shea, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
18 18 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 06/09 12:39 PM
ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 6/9/2015) (kgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
17 17 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/08 8:48 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/27/2015) (ajs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
15 15 order Order Withdrawing Case from Mediation Wed 05/27 4:47 PM
ORDER CLOSING MEDIATION: The parties attended an Initial Pretrial Conference on May 27, 2015. As stated during the conference, the referral of this matter to mediation is terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/27/2015) (kgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Wed 05/27 4:46 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 15 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2015
adr Mediator Session Scheduled Tue 05/26 2:12 PM
MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for July 16, 2015 at 10:00 AM. Session to take place at the Mediator's NYC Offices.(cda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2015
14 14 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 05/20 5:47 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Pretrial Conference is ADJOURNED to Wednesday, May 27, 2015 at 3:30 p.m. (Initial Conference set for 5/27/2015 at 03:30 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/20/2015) (spo)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report Wed 05/20 4:45 PM
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by American International Group, Inc., Sheryl Medeiros, United Guaranty Corporation.(Shea, Patrick)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 05/20 10:29 AM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Patrick W. Shea dated May 20, 2015. Document filed by American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation.(Shea, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 05/12 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/11/2015.(cda)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2015
10 10 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 05/08 3:02 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to the undersigned for all purposes. Attorneys for all parties are directed to attend an Initial Pretrial Conference before the undersigned, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, on May 21, 2015, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1306 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, and as further set forth. (Initial Conference set for 5/21/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1306, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/8/2015) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2015
11 11 order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 05/11 9:25 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Order filed January 3, 2011). Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/18/2015. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/3/2011) (rpr)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/07 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelsey Gottschalk Van Wart on behalf of American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation. (Van Wart, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/07 3:44 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation.(Shea, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/07 7:16 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation. Document filed by American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation.(Shea, Patrick)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/07 7:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick William Shea on behalf of American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation. (Shea, Patrick)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/07 6:05 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that the defendants' time to answer, move or o1herwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended for a period of thirty days, from April 7, 2015 to May 7, 2015. No prior adjournments have been requested in this action. So Ordered this 7 day of April 2015. American International Group, Inc. answer due 5/7/2015; United Guaranty Corporation answer due 5/7/2015. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/7/2015) (kl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 03/23 6:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United Guaranty Corporation served on 3/17/2015, answer due 4/7/2015. Service was accepted by Arlene Divens, Assistant to Sarah F. Millard, General Counsel. Document filed by Sheryl Medeiros. (Williams, Milton)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 03/23 6:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. American International Group, Inc. served on 3/17/2015, answer due 4/7/2015. Service was accepted by James Geness, Legal Department. Document filed by Sheryl Medeiros. (Williams, Milton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2015
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/12 3:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/12 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401119476)Document filed by Sheryl Medeiros.(moh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 03/12 3:43 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to American International Group, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 03/12 3:44 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 03/12 3:44 PM
Case Designated ECF. (moh)
Related: [-]