Dorsey v. Sigma Alpha Epsilon Fraternity, Inc. et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Lioi |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-00487 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 09, 2015 11:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
Logan Boggs
275 Spicer Street
Akron, OH 44304 |
|
Defendant
Officer John/Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Does
|
|
Defendant
Officer Lawrence Kouri
University of Akron Police Department 146 Hill Street
Akron, OH 44325 |
|
Defendant
Officer J. Krantz
|
|
Defendant
Brandon McWayne
190 Wheeler
Akron, OH 44304 |
|
Defendant
Officer K. Pierson
|
|
Defendant
Officer Jeff Samaco
University of Akron Police Department 146 Hill Street
Akron, OH 44325 |
|
Defendant
Sigma Alpha Epsilon Fraternity, Inc.
1856 Sheridan Road
Evanston, IL 60201 |
|
Defendant
Sigma Alpha Epsilon, Ohi-Phi Chapter
|
|
Defendant
Cameron Thompson
275 Spicer Street
Akron, OH 44304 |
|
Defendant
Nicholas Weisand
|
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Dorsey
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit alleges racially-charged attack at University of Akron's Sigma Alpha Epsilon fraternity (video, photos) (cleveland.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/16/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order of Dismissal: This matter comes before the Court upon plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. (Doc. No.5 .) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), plaintiff may dismiss an action by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff in this case has filed such a notice, and no answer or motion for summary judgment has been filed. Therefore, this case is closed. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/30/2015. (P,J) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to dismiss Voluntarily filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Dorsey. (Madison, Walter) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order: The complaint in this action was filed on March 13, 2015. In reviewing the docket there is no indication that service of the complaint has been perfected upon any defendant. The plaintiff is directed to show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution due to the failure to serve the complaint. Plaintiff must file a written response on or before July 29, 2015. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/20/2015. (P,J) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/16/2015. (P,J) |
|
Friday, March 13, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided or issued. (S,He) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Complaint with jury demand against Logan Boggs, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 - 10, John 1-50 Does, Lawrence Kouri, Brandon McWayne, k Pierson, Jeff Samaco, Sigma Alpha Epsilon Fraternity, Inc., Cameron Thompson, nicholas Weisand, J krantz. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7001080. Filed by gabriel dorsey. (Madison, Walter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Fri 03/13 4:04 PM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (S,He) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/13 4:06 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,He) |