Jarman v. VII Peaks Capital LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maxine M Chesney |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-01391 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 8:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
VII Peaks Capital LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Matthew Jarman
15234 Lakes of Delray blvd
Delray beach, FL 33484 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 22, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 04/22 12:51 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER. Jarman v. VII Peaks Capital LLC, 15-1391 DMR, is related to VII Peaks Capital LLC v Jarman, 14-4426 MMC. The Clerk is ordered to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 22, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015) (tlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (4/22/2015) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 04/13 1:33 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Wed 04/08 9:35 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re No. 14-cv-4426-MMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/8/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 03/27 1:39 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2015 01:30 PM. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/27 1:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Matthew Jarman. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/27 1:33 PM
COMPLAINT against VII Peaks Capital LLC. Filed byMichael Matthew Jarman.(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |