Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robert N Scola, Jr
Referred: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Case #: 0:15-cv-60680
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2611 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2015
Terminated:Sep 24, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 30, 2015 11:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Broward Health
Represented By
Caran Louise Rothchild
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Kristina Lee Ciaffi
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Mediator
Robyn S. Hankins
Plaintiff
Andrea Santiago
Represented By
Christopher Charles Sharp
Sharp Law Firm, P.A.
contact info

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, October 08, 2015
30 30 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/08 3:58 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/06/2015. (yar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/02 4:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Andrea Santiago(Sharp, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 24, 2015
28 28 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/24 1:48 PM
Order Administratively Closing Case Upon Notice Of Settlement. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/24/2015. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
27 27 adr Mediation Report Wed 09/23 4:42 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Robyn S. Hankins. Disposition: Settled in full.(Hankins, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
26 26 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/15 4:02 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Broward Health. Responses due by 10/2/2015(Ciaffi, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 11, 2015
25 25 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/11 10:45 AM
ORDER RESCHEDULING MEDIATION; denying as moot23 Motion to Reschedule Mediation Conference; granting24 Motion to Reschedule Mediation Conference. Mediation Hearing set for 9/18/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 09/10/2015. (yar)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 07, 2015
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/07 11:02 AM
Agreed MOTION to Reschedule Mediation Conference to September 18, 2015 by Andrea Santiago.(Sharp, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/02 4:37 PM
Agreed MOTION to Reschedule Mediation Conference by Andrea Santiago.(Sharp, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
22 22 order Order Scheduling Mediation Thu 08/27 8:05 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Robyn S. Hankins Mediation Hearing set for 9/3/2015 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/18/2015. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2015
21 21 order Order Scheduling Mediation Thu 08/20 7:47 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Robyn S. Hankins. Mediation Hearing set for 9/3/2015 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/18/2015. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
20 20 adr Notice of Mediation Hearing Wed 07/29 10:31 AM
Notice of Mediation Hearing before Mediator, Robyn Hankins filed by Broward Health. Mediation Hearing set for 9/3/2015 01:00 PM(Ciaffi, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 11, 2015
19 19 adr Notice of Mediator Selection (Optional Hearing) Thu 06/11 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Robyn S. Hankins selected. Filed/Added by Andrea Santiago. (Sharp, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2015
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 05/29 3:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 2/22/2016 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 2/16/2016 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2015., Expert Discovery due by 10/20/2015., Fact Discovery due by 9/4/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 6/26/2015., In Limine Motions due by 1/4/2016., Dispositive Motions due by 9/18/2015., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/12/2016., Status Report due by 7/28/2015.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 9/25/2015. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/29/2015. (ar2)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Expedite Fri 05/29 3:38 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants16 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Trial and Assign Case to Expedited Case Management Track. The Court will place this case on an expedited track. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/29/2015. (jkr)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Expedite Fri 05/29 11:17 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Trial and Assign Case to Expedited Case Management Track by Andrea Santiago. (Sharp, Christopher)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 05/29 11:13 AM
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Andrea Santiago (Sharp, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2015
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/15 4:38 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Broward Health. (Ciaffi, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 05/13 8:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants Defendant's12 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's Response is due May 15, 2015. No additional extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/13/2015. (jkr) Modified text on 5/13/2015 (ar2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 05/12 5:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Broward Health.(Ciaffi, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 11, 2015
11 11 notice Notice of Unavailability Mon 05/11 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Andrea Santiago for dates of July 23, 2015 to August 4, 2015 (Sharp, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2015
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 04/28 10:49 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's Response is due May 12, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/28/2015. (jkr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2015
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 04/27 3:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Broward Health.(Ciaffi, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 20, 2015
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 04/20 11:51 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Andrea Santiago. Broward Health served on 4/8/2015, answer due 4/29/2015. (Sharp, Christopher) Modified text on 4/20/2015 (ar2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2015
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/16 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caran Louise Rothchild on behalf of Broward Health. Attorney Caran Louise Rothchild added to party Broward Health(pty:dft). (Rothchild, Caran)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/16 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristina Lee Ciaffi on behalf of Broward Health. Attorney Kristina Lee Ciaffi added to party Broward Health(pty:dft). (Ciaffi, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2015
5 5 order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Order Referring Case to Judge Tue 04/07 7:38 AM
Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/6/2015. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2015
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/03 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Broward Health. (bb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM Fri 04/03 11:41 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (bb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Fri 04/03 11:41 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (bb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/03 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Broward Health. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7614778, filed by Andrea Santiago.(Sharp, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)