Wisconsin Western District Court
Case #: 3:11-cv-00846
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2011
Terminated:Nov 05, 2013
Defendant
Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff
Jeffrey A. Barr

GPO Nov 05 2013
Entry Reviewing the Commissioner's Decision. Decision reversed and remanded for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by District Judge Jane E. Magnus-Stinson on 11/5/2013. (lak)
GPO Nov 05 2013
FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 58, vacating the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security and remanding case for further proceedings under sentence four of section 405(g). Signed by District Judge Jane E. Magnus-Stinson on 11/5/2013. (lak) (Main Document 26 replaced on 11/6/2013). (lak)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.