Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:James D Peterson
Referred: Stephen L Crocker
Case #: 3:15-cv-00211
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2015
Terminated:Aug 03, 2015
Last checked: Monday Oct 05, 2015 10:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Patience D. Roggensack
Represented By
Kevin Michael St. John
St. John Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Pam Radloff
Represented By
Jason J Heinen
J. Peterman Legal Group, Ltd.
contact info
Daniel P. Lennington
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Sean Michael Murphy
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Maria S. Lazar
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Brian P. Keenan
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Matt Adamczyk
Represented By
Lewis W. Beilin
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel P. Lennington
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Sean Michael Murphy
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Maria S. Lazar
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Brian P. Keenan
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
David T. Prosser, Jr.
Represented By
Kevin Michael St. John
St. John Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Margaret Brady
Represented By
Lewis W. Beilin
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel P. Lennington
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Sean Michael Murphy
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Maria S. Lazar
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Brian P. Keenan
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
N. Patrick Crooks
Represented By
Kevin Michael St. John
St. John Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael J. Gabelman
Represented By
Kevin Michael St. John
St. John Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ann Walsh Bradley
Represented By
Ann Walsh Bradley
Wisconsin Supreme Court
contact info
Defendant
Annette Kingsland Ziegler
Represented By
Kevin Michael St. John
St. John Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Doug La Follette
Represented By
Lewis W. Beilin
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel P. Lennington
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Sean Michael Murphy
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Maria S. Lazar
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Roger Alan Sage
Attorney Roger Sage
contact info
Brian P. Keenan
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Wisconsin Department of Administration
Represented By
Lewis W. Beilin
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel P. Lennington
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Sean Michael Murphy
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Maria S. Lazar
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Brian P. Keenan
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Scott Neitzel
Represented By
Lewis W. Beilin
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel P. Lennington
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Sean Michael Murphy
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Maria S. Lazar
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Brian P. Keenan
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
David Perkins
Represented By
Robert Stephen Peck
Center For Constitutional Litigation, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
John V. Lien
Represented By
Robert Stephen Peck
Center For Constitutional Litigation, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilyn Wittry
Represented By
Robert Stephen Peck
Center For Constitutional Litigation, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph P. Heim
Represented By
Robert Stephen Peck
Center For Constitutional Litigation, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hilde Adler
Represented By
Robert Stephen Peck
Center For Constitutional Litigation, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirley S. Abrahamson
Represented By
Robert Stephen Peck
Center For Constitutional Litigation, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Intervenor Defendant
Kliesmet Chris
Terminated: 04/14/2015
Represented By
Elizabeth Price Foley
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Andrew Michael Grossman
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
David Boris Rivkin, Jr
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Orville Seymer
Terminated: 04/14/2015
Represented By
Elizabeth Price Foley
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Andrew Michael Grossman
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
David Boris Rivkin, Jr
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Dara Mailette
Terminated: 04/14/2015
Represented By
Elizabeth Price Foley
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Andrew Michael Grossman
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
David Boris Rivkin, Jr
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Chris Martinson
Terminated: 04/14/2015
Represented By
Elizabeth Price Foley
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Andrew Michael Grossman
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
David Boris Rivkin, Jr
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Vincient Schmuki
Terminated: 04/14/2015
Represented By
Elizabeth Price Foley
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Andrew Michael Grossman
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
David Boris Rivkin, Jr
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 09 2015
ORDER denying 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. This case is scheduled for a Status Conference on 4/21/2015 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/9/2015. (voc)
GPO Apr 14 2015
ORDER denying 9 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/14/15. (jat)
GPO Apr 22 2015
ORDER Setting Briefing schedule re 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' oppositions due by 5/4/2015, brief in reply due by 5/11/2015. Motion hearing set for 5/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' renewed motion for a temporary restraining order is denied. Defendants may have until May 4, 2015, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/22/2015. (voc)
GPO May 19 2015
ORDER denying without prejudice 57 Defendant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice ; denying as moot 62 Motion in Limine to Exclude Portions of the Verified Affidavit of Shirley S. Abrahamson; Denying as moot 63 motion in Limine To Exclude All Factual Allegations In Verified Complaint; Denying as moot 64 Motion in Limine to Exclude Affidavit of Ann Walsh Bradley in Support of a Preliminary Injunction; Denying 3 Motion for Temporary Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/19/2015. (voc)
GPO May 27 2015
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 81 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1) Order, # (2) Docket Sheet) (lak)
GPO Jun 04 2015
ORDER denying 91 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 06/04/2015. (mfh)
GPO Jun 10 2015
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion to Strike 89 Declaration of Shirley S. Abrahamson by Defendants N. Patrick Crooks, Michael J. Gabelman, Annette Kingsland Ziegler, David T. Prosser, Jr, Patience D. Roggensack. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/10/2015. (voc)
GPO Jul 31 2015
ORDER granting defendants' motion to dismiss, converted into motions for summary judgment, dkts. 45 and 49; denying as moot 90 Motion to Take Judicial Notice; denying as moot 112 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/31/2015. (arw)
GPO Aug 03 2015
ley and Wisconsin Department of Administration dismissing the case. (VO) Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 8/3/2015. (voc) JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Matt Adamczyk, Margaret Brady, N. Patrick Crooks, Michael J. Gabelman, Annette Kingsland Ziegler, Doug La Follette, Scott Neitzel, David T. Prosser, Jr, Pam Radloff, Patience D. Roggensack, Ann Walsh Brad
GPO Sep 04 2015
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 130 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # (1) Order #127, # (2) Judgment, # (3) Docket Sheet) (voc)

1. Federal Judge dismisses Shirley Abrahamson's civil rights case (watchdog.org)
Submitted Mon 08/03/2015
2. Chief Justice Shirley Abrahamson sues over amendment approved by voters : Wsj (host.madison.com)
Submitted Fri 04/10/2015
3. The Monarch of Madison (wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 04/10/2015
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, November 20, 2015
135 135 appeal USCA Order Fri 11/20 7:45 AM
ORDER from USCA Re:130 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marilyn Wittry, Joseph P. Heim, David Perkins, Hilde Adler, Shirley S. Abrahamson, John V. Lien No record to be returned. (voc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Issuance of Mandate
Monday, November 16, 2015
134 134 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 11/16 3:21 PM
Notice of Change of Address by Robert Stephen Peck (Peck, Robert)
Related: [-]