Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Leslie J Abrams
Case #: 1:15-cv-00067
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2015 12:40 PM EDT
Defendant
CITY OF BAINBRIDGE
Represented By
RALEIGH ROLLINS
contact info
Defendant
CITY OF PELHAM
Represented By
W BRENT HYDE
contact info
Defendant
CHIEF EXEC OFFICER MARGARET CRUTCHFIELD
Represented By
J HOLDER SMITH, JR
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-3
Represented By
W BRENT HYDE
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 4-6
Defendant
POLICE CHIEF NEALIE MCCORMICK
Represented By
W BRENT HYDE
contact info
Defendant
DIRECTOR ERIC MILLER
Represented By
RALEIGH ROLLINS
contact info
Defendant
PROBATON OFFICER MARTIELE PICKLE
Represented By
J HOLDER SMITH, JR
contact info
JOHN C SPURLIN
contact info
Defendant
RED HILLS COMMUNITY PROBATION LLC
Represented By
J HOLDER SMITH, JR
contact info
Defendant
PROBATION OFFICER JODI SIMPSON
Represented By
J HOLDER SMITH, JR
contact info
Plaintiff
FRED BARBER
Represented By
RYAN PRIMERANO
contact info
GERALD R WEBER
contact info
SARAH ELISABETH GERAGHTY
contact info
Plaintiff
VERA CHEEKS
Represented By
RYAN PRIMERANO
contact info
GERALD R WEBER
contact info
SARAH ELISABETH GERAGHTY
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES H DAVIS, JR
Represented By
RYAN PRIMERANO
contact info
GERALD R WEBER
contact info
SARAH ELISABETH GERAGHTY
contact info
Plaintiff
ADEL EDWARDS
Represented By
RYAN PRIMERANO
contact info
GERALD R WEBER
contact info
SARAH ELISABETH GERAGHTY
contact info
Plaintiff
ULYSSES WEST
Represented By
RYAN PRIMERANO
contact info
GERALD R WEBER
contact info
SARAH ELISABETH GERAGHTY
contact info

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/01 3:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by FRED BARBER, VERA CHEEKS, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST (GERAGHTY, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2016
31 31 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/01 3:02 PM
CONSENT ORDER regarding26 Motion. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 02/01/2016. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2016
30 30 misc Sealed Document Tue 01/26 11:07 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT - Settlement Agreement (bcl)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 01/26 10:29 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting28 Motion for Leave to File. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 1/26/2016.(rdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2015
28 28 motion Leave to File Mon 12/28 1:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by FRED BARBER, VERA CHEEKS, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST filed by RYAN PRIMERANO.(PRIMERANO, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal
Tuesday, November 10, 2015
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/10 3:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by FRED BARBER, VERA CHEEKS, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST (GERAGHTY, SARAH)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/10 3:56 PM
JOINT MOTION Entry of Consent Order by FRED BARBER, VERA CHEEKS, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST filed by SARAH ELISABETH GERAGHTY.(GERAGHTY, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order
Friday, October 23, 2015
25 25 order Order Fri 10/23 12:32 PM
ORDER re23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by FRED BARBER, VERA CHEEKS, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST, JAMES H DAVIS, JR. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 10/23/2015. (mdm)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Amended Motion Fri 10/23 12:21 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion; granting22 Amended Motion. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 10/23/2015. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Standing Order Concerning Probation Supervision,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement and General Release
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/21 12:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by FRED BARBER, VERA CHEEKS, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST (GERAGHTY, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2015
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 10/05 9:17 AM
*DISREGARD* Notice of Deficiency; Document must be refiled to separate out exhibit from proposed text order. You must include a description of exhibit(s) - Related [+]. (mdm) Modified on 10/5/2015 (mdm)
Related: [-] 22 AMENDED MOTION filed by VERA CHEEKS, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST, JAMES H DAVIS, JR
Friday, October 02, 2015
22 22 motion AMENDED MOTION Fri 10/02 2:08 PM
AMENDED MOTION Amending20 MOTION by VERA CHEEKS, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST filed by SARAH ELISABETH GERAGHTY.(GERAGHTY, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
21 21 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Wed 09/23 3:43 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER : Discovery to be complete by 3/21/2016. Dispositive motions due by 5/5/2016. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 09/23/2015. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 09/22 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS: Scheduling Conference held on 9/22/2015. Scheduling/Discovery Order to be entered. Court Reporter: Darlene Fuller. (mtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2015
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/17 5:06 PM
CONSENT MOTION by CITY OF BAINBRIDGE, ERIC MILLER filed by RALEIGH ROLLINS.(ROLLINS, RALEIGH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Order
Monday, August 31, 2015
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/31 10:39 AM
NOTICE Substitution of Party by FRED BARBER, VERA CHEEKS, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST (PRIMERANO, RYAN)
Related: [-]
misc Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received Mon 08/31 3:59 PM
Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received and forwarded to Chambers. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2015
18 18 order Order - Rules 16/26 Fri 07/17 5:17 PM
AMENDED RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/31/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2015 11:00 AM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS. Corporate Disclosures due by 7/31/2015. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 7/17/2015. (mtc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 06/23 2:52 PM
Notice of Deficiency; Document does not have to be refiled. In the future, please convert document into text-searchable PDF prior to filing - Related [+]. (mdm)
Related: [-] 17 Jury Demand filed by JOHN DOES 1-3, CITY OF PELHAM, NEALIE MCCORMICK
Monday, June 22, 2015
17 17 misc Jury Demand Mon 06/22 10:36 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CITY OF PELHAM, JOHN DOES 1-3, NEALIE MCCORMICK (HYDE, W)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2015
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/19 10:34 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by CITY OF PELHAM, JOHN DOES 1-3, NEALIE MCCORMICK.(HYDE, W)Attorney W BRENT HYDE added to party CITY OF PELHAM(pty:dft), Attorney W BRENT HYDE added to party JOHN DOES 1-3(pty:dft), Attorney W BRENT HYDE added to party NEALIE MCCORMICK(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2015
notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/22 1:12 PM
NOTICE that the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for 7/22/15 and ALL deadlines contained in the Rules 16&26 Order (Doc. 15) are continued until further order of the Court - re15 Order - Rules 16/26. (wks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
15 15 order Order - Rules 16/26 Thu 05/21 4:52 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2015 at 11:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge LESLIE J ABRAMS. Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/6/2015. Corporate Disclosures due by 6/4/2015. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 05/21/2015. (mtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2015
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/07 5:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARGARET CRUTCHFIELD, MARTIELE PICKLE, RED HILLS COMMUNITY PROBATION LLC, JODI SIMPSON (SMITH, J)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Jury Demand Thu 05/07 5:11 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARGARET CRUTCHFIELD, MARTIELE PICKLE, RED HILLS COMMUNITY PROBATION LLC, JODI SIMPSON (SMITH, J)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/07 5:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by MARGARET CRUTCHFIELD, MARTIELE PICKLE, RED HILLS COMMUNITY PROBATION LLC, JODI SIMPSON.(SMITH, J)Attorney J HOLDER SMITH, JR added to party MARGARET CRUTCHFIELD(pty:dft), Attorney J HOLDER SMITH, JR added to party MARTIELE PICKLE(pty:dft), Attorney J HOLDER SMITH, JR added to party RED HILLS COMMUNITY PROBATION LLC(pty:dft), Attorney J HOLDER SMITH, JR added to party JODI SIMPSON(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2015
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 04/30 3:25 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings re3 Summons Issued by MARTIELE PICKLE (SPURLIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
10 10 misc Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent Fri 04/10 3:15 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to FRED BARBER, VERA CHEEKS, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, ULYSSES WEST (wks)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 04/10 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to RED HILLS COMMUNITY PROBATION LLC on 4/10/2015. (wks)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 04/10 3:12 PM
Summons Issued as to CITY OF PELHAM on 4/10/2015. (wks)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 04/10 3:11 PM
Summons Issued as to CITY OF BAINBRIDGE on 4/10/2015. (wks)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 04/10 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to ERIC MILLER on 4/10/2015. (wks)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 04/10 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to NEALIE MCCORMICK on 4/10/2015. (wks)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/10 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to JODI SIMPSON on 4/10/2015. (wks)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/10 3:03 PM
Summons Issued as to MARTIELE PICKLE on 4/10/2015. (wks)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/10 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to MARGARET CRUTCHFIELD on 4/10/2015. (wks)
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/10 1:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants; Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 2055337, filed by VERA CHEEKS, ULYSSES WEST, JAMES H DAVIS, JR, ADEL EDWARDS, FRED BARBER.(wks)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet