Roberts Broadcasting Company of Columbia, SC, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:11-bk-50744
Lead case is: 4:11-bk-50744
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 4:11-bk-50747 |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2011 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2014 |
Debtor
Roberts Broadcasting Company of Columbia, SC, LLC
1747 Cushman Dr
Columbia, SC 29204-1656 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
111 South Tenth Street Suite 6353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
Docket last updated: 10/27/2017 11:45 AM CDT |
Friday, October 07, 2011 | ||
1 | 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1039 Filed by Roberts Broadcasting Company of Columbia, SC, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 04/4/2012. Summary of schedules due 10/21/2011. Schedule A due 10/21/2011. Schedule B due 10/21/2011. Schedule C due 10/21/2011. Schedule D due 10/21/2011. Schedule E due 10/21/2011. Schedule F due 10/21/2011. Schedule G due 10/21/2011. Schedule H due 10/21/2011. Schedule I due 10/21/2011. Schedule J due 10/21/2011. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 10/21/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/21/2011. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 10/21/2011. Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due 10/21/2011. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities due 10/21/2011. Credit Counseling Date: 10/21/2011. Chapter 11 Plan due by 02/6/2012. Disclosure Statement due by 02/6/2012. (DeWoskin, A.) | |
2 | 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-50747 [misc,volp11a] (1039.00). Receipt number 7357500, amount $1039.00. (U.S. Treasury) | |
3 | 3 Order and Notice of Missing Documents or Other Information Court Certificate of Mailing. Number of notices mailed: 2. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 10/14/2011.Atty Disclosure Statement or Non Atty Disclosure Statement due 10/14/2011. (blar) | |
4 | 4 Order and Notice of Missing Documents Summary of schedules due 10/21/2011. Schedule A due 10/21/2011. Schedule B due 10/21/2011. Schedule D due 10/21/2011. Schedule E due 10/21/2011. Schedule F due 10/21/2011. Schedule G due 10/21/2011. Schedule H due 10/21/2011. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 10/21/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/21/2011. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 10/21/2011. (blar) | |
5 | 5 Order Transferring Judge . (mccj) | |
6 | 6 This bankruptcy case is transferred to Judge Barry S. Schermer. , Notice of Reassignment of Judge. (mccj) |