Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael J Mcshane
Case #: 3:15-cv-00854
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Case Filed:May 18, 2015
Terminated:Sep 22, 2016

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 22, 2016
23 23 service Clerks Notice of Mailing Thu 09/22 5:11 PM
Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Corey Agard of Order21 and Judgment22 . (gw)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Judgment - Terminate Case Thu 09/22 5:08 PM
Judgment by Clerk. This action is dismissed. Signed on 9/22/2016 by Deputy Clerk G. Williams. (gw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2016
21 21 order Order Thu 09/22 5:06 PM
ORDER. Based on all of the foregoing, defendants' Motion to Dismiss15 is allowed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter a judgment dismissing this action. Any appeal from this Order or Judgment dismissing this case would be frivolous and not taken in good faith. Therefore, plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is hereby revoked. Signed on 9/19/2016 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2016
20 20 order Summary Judgment or 12(b) Dismissal Advice Notice - FORM EVENT Thu 08/25 3:40 PM
Summary Judgment Advice Notice and Scheduling Order regarding Motion to Dismiss15 . Response is due by 9/29/2016. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Copy mailed to petitioner) (cp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2016
19 19 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 07/07 5:36 PM
Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief. Filed by Corey Agard. (gw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
18 18 oth_ans Reply Tue 01/19 11:29 PM
Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint . Filed by Juan D Castillo, Marion Feather, Princess Haverly, Richard Kowalczyk, Daniel Williams. Related [+] (Wight, Natalie)
Related: [-] Response to Motion17 .
Monday, January 04, 2016
17 17 resp Response to Motion Tue 01/05 10:35 AM
Response to Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 15 . Filed by Corey Agard. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2015
16 16 oth_sup Declaration Fri 12/11 1:43 PM
Declaration of Autumn Norris in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint . Filed by Juan D Castillo, Marion Feather, Princess Haverly, Richard Kowalczyk, Daniel Williams. Related [+] (Wight, Natalie)
Related: [-] Motion to Dismiss15 .
Att: 1 Attachment 1,
Att: 2 Attachment 2,
Att: 3 Attachment 3,
Att: 4 Attachment 4
15 15 motion Dismiss Fri 12/11 1:39 PM
Motion to Dismiss the Complaint . Filed by Princess Haverly, Richard Kowalczyk, Marion Feather, Juan D Castillo, Daniel Williams. (Wight, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
14 14 order Order on Motion Tue 10/06 2:55 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion to Set Answer Date12 . Answer is due 12/11/2015. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Copy mailed to petitioner) (cp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
13 13 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Mon 09/28 4:16 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Princess Haverly. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2015
12 12 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Fri 09/18 4:43 PM
Motion to Set Answer Date . Filed by Juan D Castillo, Marion Feather, Princess Haverly, Richard Kowalczyk, Daniel Williams. (Wight, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
11 11 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 08/27 10:54 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Juan D Castillo. (dsg)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 08/27 10:53 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Daniel Williams. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
9 9 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 08/06 11:50 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Marion Feather. (dsg)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 08/06 11:49 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Richard Kowalczyk served on 7/30/2015, answer due on 8/20/2015. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2015
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 07/20 2:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Juan D Castillo, Marion Feather, Princess Haverly, Richard Kowalczyk, Daniel Williams. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (dsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2015
6 6 order Issue Process Mon 07/06 9:10 AM
ORDER TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE and TO ISSUE and SERVE PROCESS Plaintiff's Application to proceed in forma pauperis5 is allowed. Order to Issue Process and Directing Service by the US Marshal. Signed on 7/2/15 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Sent order to Marion Feather) (Sent order, USM forms and summons to plaintiff) (dsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
5 5 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Fri 06/12 2:42 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Corey Agard. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
4 4 order Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT Thu 06/04 8:23 AM
ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The application1 is DENIED. Plaintiff may file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. The amended application must bear the Civil No. 3:15-cv-854-MC. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 6/2/15 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed order and IFP form to plaintiff) (dsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2015
3 3 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Tue 05/19 2:56 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed copy to plaintiff) (dsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2015
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 05/19 2:52 PM
Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending Filed by Corey Agard against Juan D Castillo, Marion Feather, Princess Haverly, Richard Kowalczyk, Daniel Williams. (dsg)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Tue 05/19 2:47 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Corey Agard. (dsg)
Related: [-]