BERARD v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Kollar-Kotelly |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00891 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 07, 2015 6:43 AM EST |
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DENNIS BERARD
2636 Lower Mountain Road
Ransomville, NY 14131 |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
order
.Order
Thu 08/18 7:13 PM
ORDER. In light of the filing of BOP's39 Notice indicating that it will not file any objections, and for the reasons stated in the Court's35 Memorandum Opinion issued on July 21, 2016, it is hereby ORDERED that the record at issue, containing the redactions recommended by the Court and reviewed by BOP, filed on the public docket as ECF No. 37 , shall be UNSEALED, and a copy shall be mailed to pro se Plaintiff at his address of record. This is a final, appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/18/2016. (lcckk1) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/17 2:41 PM
NOTICE to the Court by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS re Set/Reset Deadlines (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Fri 07/29 11:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's38 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall respond to the Court's 7/21/2016 Order by no later than AUGUST 18, 2016. The Court reiterates, as explained in that Order, that, if Defendant does not file objections, the Court will release the document as proposed to Plaintiff. If Defendant does have objections, it shall state the reasons for those objections. If the Court disagrees with those objections, the Court will provide Defendant a further opportunity to respond prior to considering any release.The Court notes that no response is necessary from Plaintiff because at issue is the in camera review of a document. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/29/2016. (lcckk2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 07/29 11:39 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to the Court's 7/21/2016 Order by 8/18/2016. (dot) |
||
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time to
Thu 07/28 6:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Court's Order of July 21, 2016 re sealed document. by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Order
Thu 07/21 10:08 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part21 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying25 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/21/16. (dot) |
|
35 | 35
19
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Thu 07/21 9:53 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/21/16. (dot) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/08 2:54 PM
NOTICE (Defendant's Notice of Submission in Camera) by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS re31 Order,,,,,, (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
18
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 06/27 12:05 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DENNIS BERARD. (znmw) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 06/27 12:04 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit A) filed by DENNIS BERARD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw) |
|
31 | 31
order
.Order
Fri 06/24 10:24 AM
ORDER re Plaintiff's27 Motion for Protective Order. Upon review of the parties' submissions, it is hereby ORDERED that the relief requested by Plaintiff in his27 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Exhibit A to Plaintiff's27 Motion for Procedure Order, see ECF No.27 , at 5-12, on the docket UNDER SEAL. The Court also observes that Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, see ECF No.27 , at 13-30, appears to have been docketed in error as part of Plaintiff's27 Motion for Protective Order. In light of the foregoing, it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall re-file Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, see ECF No.27 , at 13-30, as a separate entry on the public docket. Additionally, upon review of the parties' submissions, the Court finds that the in camera review of the requested document would aid the Court in resolving the remaining issues in this case, specifically those raised by the parties while briefing Defendant's21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. In light of the foregoing, it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall, by no later than JULY 8, 2016, submit to the Court, for in camera review, an unredacted version of the document produced by Defendant in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/24/2016. Finally, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiff at his address of record.(lcckk1) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 03/24 5:45 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re25 MOTION for Order /Motion for Judicial Notice filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response to motion
Wed 03/23 3:52 PM
RESPONSE re27 MOTION for Protective Order filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 03/23 3:47 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Protective Order
Wed 03/16 4:16 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by DENNIS BERARD (td) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
.Order
Mon 03/07 8:42 AM
ORDER. As of the date of this Order, Plaintiff has not filed with the Court any documents that could be construed as a response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. In light of the foregoing, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file with the Court his Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than March 31, 2016 . If Plaintiff does not respond, the Court may consider Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment conceded. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Government shall file a responsive brief within 10 business days of the date that Plaintiff's Opposition is filed with the Court . The Government's responsive brief should address the arguments made in Plaintiff's Opposition, as well as Plaintiff's25 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/7/2016. (lcckk1) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 03/08 9:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/31/2016. (dot) |
||
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Motion For Order
Thu 02/25 12:04 PM
MOTION to take Judicial Notice by DENNIS BERARD (td) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/08 5:33 PM
NOTICE to the Court (of receipt of Plaintiff's Opposition papers) by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS re23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,, (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 01/29 1:30 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is hereby ORDERED that the Government shall promptly mail a copy of its17 Motion for Summary Judgment to Plaintiff's address of record via certified mail. The Government shall file a notice with the Court, which includes relevant tracking information that indicates Plaintiff's receipt of the mailing. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Response to the Government's17 Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than FEBRUARY 29, 2016. The Government shall file its Reply by MARCH 15, 2016. No further extensions shall be granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/29/2016. (lcckk1) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 01/29 3:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/29/2016. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2016. (dot) |
||
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 12/30 4:42 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment 1 (Declaration of Donna Johnson and exhibits), | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
.Order
Tue 12/01 11:08 AM
ORDER re Defendant's18 Response to Order of the Court and Plaintiff's16 Proposed Joint Status Report. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than December 30, 2015; Plaintiff shall file his Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than January 29, 2016; Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than February 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/1/2015. (lcckk1) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
Tue 12/01 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer was entered in error and was refiled by counsel as Docket Entry18 Response to Order of the Court. (znmw) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 12/01 5:30 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 12/30/2015. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/29/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/15/2016. (dot) |
||
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Errata
Mon 11/30 5:30 PM
ERRATA as to ECF No. 17 by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Response to Order of the Court
Mon 11/30 5:28 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, and Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 11/30 5:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Fri 11/20 4:18 PM
Proposed STATUS REPORT and briefing schedule by DENNIS BERARD. (td) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 10/30 6:36 PM
ORDER denying AS MOOT Defendant's12 Motion for Extension of Time and denying Plaintiff's13 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Answer. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report in accordance with this Order by NOVEMBER 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/30/2015. (lcckk1) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Fri 10/30 3:52 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DENNIS BERARD. (td) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/02 4:08 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2015. (dot) |
||
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 10/29 2:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:10 by DENNIS BERARD(td) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 10/28 5:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report and Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
.Order
Wed 09/30 9:26 AM
ORDER re Defendant's10 Answer. It is unclear from Defendant's Answer whether Defendant has released those records segregated by Defendant as nonexempt. If Defendant has not already done so, Defendant shall release to Plaintiff those nonexempt records by OCTOBER 12, 2015. The parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report not later than NOVEMBER 2, 2015, indicating whether Plaintiff is satisfied with Defendant's response and whether further briefing is necessary to resolve the dispute. If the parties determine that further briefing is necessary, the Joint Status Report shall include a proposed schedule for such briefing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/30/2015. (lcckk1) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 09/30 10:09 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to release non-exempt records by 10/12/2015. Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2015. (dot) |
||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 09/29 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Court shall grant Defendant's9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court notes that Defendant's counsel filed Defendant's Answer within a day of realizing that she mistakenly calendared the due date of Defendant's Answer to be 60 days after service, rather than 30 days as required under FOIA. Defendant's counsel took immediate steps to obtain a litigation report from the Bureau of Prisons and promptly filed the Answer. Plaintiff pro se has neither consented to, nor opposed, Defendant's Motion since Defendant's counsel filed the Motion on September 17, 2015. Accordingly, the Court grants Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and treats Defendant's Answer as timely filed. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/29/2015. (lcckk1) |
||
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/18 5:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 09/17 7:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/18 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Wed 08/05 10:19 AM
SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to4 Order. (md) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 08/03 6:46 PM
ORDER. For the reasons stated in this Order, the Court hereby DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Docket and GRANTS Plaintiff's "Ex Parte Motion to Appoint Marshal to Serve Summons and Complaint." Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS the United States Marshal Service to serve Defendant in the above-captioned case with the Summons and Complaint. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that the U.S. Marshal Service shall serve Defendant prior to OCTOBER 8, 2015. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that the U.S Marshal Service shall promptly file a return of service affidavit on the docket once service has been completed. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/3/2015. (lcckk3) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 07/27 8:00 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct the docket by DENNIS BERARD (jf) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
.Order
Thu 06/11 4:42 PM
ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 11, 2015. (NS) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/11 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616071048) filed by DENNIS BERARD.(td) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 06/11 1:06 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) |