TALON INDUSTRIES, LLC v. ROLLED METAL PRODUCTS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jamel K Semper |
Referred: | Andre M Espinosa |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-04103 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 14, 2015 8:13 AM EST |
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-20
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-20
|
|
Defendant
ROLLED METAL PRODUCTS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
arbnwk
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ANN G. SCHOEN
|
|
Plaintiff
TALON INDUSTRIES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 12 2016
OPINION AND ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/12/2016. (ld, ) |
|
GPO
Aug 30 2022
OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/30/2022. (dam) |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
misc
QC - Generic Message
Tue 07/30 9:24 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised,188 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by LILIA LONDAR on 7/29/2024 will not be assigned a case number by the Third Circuit because it is not a Notice of Appeal. This message is for informational purposes only. (adc) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
188 | 188
appeal
Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia)
Tue 07/30 12:00 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by TALON INDUSTRIES, LLC. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANJDC-15552076. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries.(LONDAR, LILIA) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of case, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement |