Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-11520

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:15-bk-11523
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2015
Terminated:Apr 04, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Milagro Producing, LLC
1301 McKinney St Ste 500
Houston, TX 77010-3089
Represented By
M. Blake Cleary
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Justin P. Duda
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Ian J Bambrick
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Monday, April 04, 2016
8 8 order Final Decree Mon 04/04 4:04 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Cases and Amending Caption of Remaining Case. Order Signed on 4/4/2016 (SH)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 04/04 4:36 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
7 7 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 08/25 6:32 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Sch F, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Milagro Producing, LLC. (Duda, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2015
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 08/14 7:00 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Milagro Producing, LLC. (Duda, Justin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 08/14 6:59 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Milagro Producing, LLC. (Duda, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 07/31 2:08 PM
Amended Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Milagro Producing, LLC. (Bambrick, Ian)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2015
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 07/17 1:21 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Related Chapter 11 Cases. An order as been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Milagro Holding, LLC; Milagro Oil & Gas, Inc.; Milagro Exploration, LLC; Milagro Producing, LLC; Milagro Mid-Continent, LLC and Milagro Resources, LLC, and all subsequently filed chapter 11 cases of such debtors' affiliates. The dockect in the chapter 11 case of Milagro Holdings, LLC, Case No. 15-11520 (KG), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 7/17/2015 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2015
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 07/15 11:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-11523 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7649313, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 07/15 10:11 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Milagro Producing, LLC. (Cleary, M. Blake)
Related: [-]