T.P., et al. v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-05346 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Sep 09, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 4:03 AM PST |
Defendant
WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S., INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. S. T.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E. A. P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M. I. P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E. G. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K. A. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M. Y. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R. C. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. L. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. W. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. A. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. F. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. J. T.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. T. T.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. D. T.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. M. T.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E. W. V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
V. T. V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. M. W.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. T. W.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. L. W.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R. D. W.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Y. Z.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T.P., by and through S.P., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian, et al.
|
|
Plaintiff
L. V. F.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. J. A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. L. B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. L. B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
V. J. B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. L. C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
N. L. C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P. A. D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. C. E.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
B. P. E.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P. F. E.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. F.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. F.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
B. D. G.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. M. H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
H. A. H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. A. J.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. D. J.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. M. J.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. A. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E. L. M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. M. N.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
V. M. N.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. E. P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/08/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
538 | 538
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Tue 10/18 10:12 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,534 filed by C. M. H., A. M. N., L. D. J., E. W. V., B. P. E., L. T. T., H. A. H., T. A. L., L. J. T., A. M. W., D. A. J., P. F. E., Y. Z., J. L. C., D. L. B., V. M. N., E. G. R., M. I. P., T. J. A., E. A. P., D. F., L. A., S. L. B., C. F., R. D. W., V. J. B., M. Y. R., S. P., L. V. F., A. E. P., T. P., B. D. G., G. L., D. L. W.. CCA # 22-55340 Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, Dkt. 25, this appeal is dismissed with prejudice. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. This order shall serve as the mandate of the court. (twdb) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
537 | 537
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 10/17 2:39 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,521 filed by C. M. H., C. P., A. M. N., L. D. J., E. W. V., B. P. E., L. T. T., H. A. H., T. A. L., L. J. T., D. A. J., A. M. W., P. F. E., Y. Z., J. L. C., D. L. B., V. M. N., E. G. R., M. I. P., K. A. R., T. J. A., E. A. P., D. F., L. A., S. L. B., C. F., R. D. W., V. J. B., M. Y. R., S. P., L. V. F., A. E. P., D. R., T. P., B. D. G., G. L., D. L. W.. CCA # 21-55829 Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. The oral argument scheduled for Tuesday, October 18, 2022, at 09:30 A.M. is REMOVED from the calendar. This order served on the district court acts as the mandate of this court. (twdb) |