Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 4:15-cv-00133
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2015
Terminated:Apr 13, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2016 12:12 PM EST
Defendant
ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC
Represented By
KATHLEEN M CAMPBELL
contact info
J NICK PHILLIPS
contact info
William N. Withrow, Jr.
contact info
MILLER PETERSON ROBINSON
contact info
Plaintiff
CHSPSC LLC
Represented By
JOHN H RAINS, IV
contact info
CHRISTOPHER T GIOVINAZZO
contact info
EDWARD B KRUGMAN
contact info

GPO Nov 10 2015
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/10/2015. (vac)

1. Lawsuit filed against St. Francis hospital unsealed (wtvm.com)
Submitted Thu 08/13/2015
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
30 30 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/13 4:23 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/13/2016. CASE CLOSED. (esl)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Dismiss Wed 04/13 1:30 PM
STIPULATED MOTION to Dismiss the action by CHSPSC LLC filed by JOHN H RAINS, IV.(RAINS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation And Agreed Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice
Monday, February 08, 2016
28 28 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/08 11:09 AM
PROTOCOL regarding electronically stored and hard copy documents. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 2/8/2016 (tlf)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 02/08 11:07 AM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER ruling25 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 2/8/2016 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/02 2:03 PM
JOINT MOTION Enter Protocol Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and Hard Copy Documents by CHSPSC LLC filed by JOHN H RAINS, IV.(RAINS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Protocol Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and Hard Copy Documents
25 25 motion Protective Order Tue 02/02 1:54 PM
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by CHSPSC LLC filed by JOHN H RAINS, IV.(RAINS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Potective Order
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 02/02 1:52 PM
Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed as a motion; Related document:23 Motion for Protective Order filed by CHSPSC, LLC. Attached document is not a motion but a proposed consent Order. Any document requiring the signature of the judge must be styled and filed as a motion (tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2016
24 24 misc Stipulation Mon 02/01 5:23 PM
STIPULATION - Protocol Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and Hard Copy Documents by CHSPSC LLC (RAINS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Protective Order Mon 02/01 5:13 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order by CHSPSC LLC filed by JOHN H RAINS, IV.(RAINS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 02/01 5:33 PM
Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed as a motion; Related document:24 Stipulation filed by HSPSC LLC. Any document requiring the signature of the judge must be styled as files as a motion (tlf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2015
22 22 misc Transcript of Proceedings Tue 12/22 11:17 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/3/2015, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Volume Number: I of I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Peterson, Betsy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
21 21 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Thu 12/03 1:07 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 9/1/2016. Dispositive motions due by 10/17/2016. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/3/2015. (esl)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 12/03 1:05 PM
Minute Entry (TEXT ONLY) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Telephone Conference held on 12/3/2015 to discuss proposed scheduling order. The Court will sign and file the parties proposed scheduling order following telephone conference, but there will be NO EXTENSIONS of the discovery period. Conference Call Participants: Chris Giovinazzo, Edward Krugman and John Rains for Plaintiff. Bill Withrow, Nick Phillips and Kathleen Campbell for defendant. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson.Time in Court: 11:03 am - 11:27 am. (esl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2015
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 12/02 5:28 PM
NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING - Telephone Conference set for 12/3/2015 11:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. INSTRUCTIONS FOR CONNECTING TO THE CALL - Dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter Participant Access Code: 8469390. At the prompt, enter Security Code: 120315 (esl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2015
misc Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received Tue 12/01 4:46 PM
Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received and forwarded to Chambers (tlp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/24 1:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC.(CAMPBELL, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2015
19 19 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint Tue 11/10 1:05 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part8 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/10/2015. (vac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
18 18 respoth Response to Court Order Tue 10/13 4:50 PM
RESPONSE to Court Order filed by ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC re15 Order on Motion to Stay (CAMPBELL, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
17 17 respoth Response to Court Order Tue 10/13 3:33 PM
RESPONSE to Court Order filed by CHSPSC LLC re15 Order on Motion to Stay (GIOVINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/02 1:21 PM
REPLY to Response filed by ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re Notice of Hearing on Motion, Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement, : (PHILLIPS, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2015
15 15 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 09/29 10:00 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Temporary Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/29/2015. (vac)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2015
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 09/25 4:54 PM
REPLY to Response filed by ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC re11 MOTION to Stay Discovery re10 Order - Rules 16/26 (PHILLIPS, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2015
13 13 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/18 5:04 PM
RESPONSE filed by CHSPSC LLC re11 MOTION to Stay Discovery re10 Order - Rules 16/26 (GIOVINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/18 2:11 PM
RESPONSE filed by CHSPSC LLC re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re Notice of Hearing on Motion, Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement, : (GIOVINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2015
11 11 motion Stay Fri 09/11 4:44 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery re10 Order - Rules 16/26 by ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC filed by KATHLEEN M CAMPBELL.(CAMPBELL, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Monday, August 31, 2015
10 10 order Order - Rules 16/26 Mon 08/31 2:06 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/16/2015 . Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 8/31/2015(tlf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/28 4:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC identifying Other Affiliate COLUMBUS GYNECOLOGY ONCOLOGY MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate SFH EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS LLC, Other Affiliate SFH COLUMBUS CARDIOLOGY LLC, Other Affiliate SFH VASCULAR INSTITUTE LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS ANESTHETISTS LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS CARDIAC MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS CARDIOVASCULAR INSTITUTE LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS CENTER FOR BREAST HEALTH LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS CENTER FOR DIGESTIVE DISORDERS LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS CENTER FOR SURGICAL CARE LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS COLUMBUS CLINIC LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS CVC LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS ELECTROPHYSIOLOGISTS GROUP LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS ENT LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS GI LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL AFFILIATED SERVICES INC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL FOUNDATION INC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INTENSIVISTS LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS HOSPITALISTS LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS GENERAL SURGEONS LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS MANAGEMENT SERVICES ORGANIZATION LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS MEDICAL GROUPS, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS NEUROLOGY LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS OBSTETRIC AND GYNECOLOGY LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS PSYCHIATRISTS LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS RADIOLOGISTS LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS URGENT CARE LLC, Other Affiliate ST FRANCIS WOUND CARE PHYSICIANS LLC, Other Affiliate THE BRADLEY CENTER for ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC. (PHILLIPS, J)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Complaint Fri 08/28 1:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss2 Complaint, filed by ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Brief (PHILLIPS, J) Modified on 8/28/2015 (tlp)
misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Fri 08/28 1:45 PM
Attorney Admission Fee Met by EDWARD B KRUGMAN. (nop)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/12 12:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHSPSC LLC as to ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL INC.(RAINS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service - St. Francis Hospital, Inc., c/o Richard Bradley, Registered Agent,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service - St. Francis Hospital, Inc., c/o Robert C. Threlkeld, Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
6 6 order Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 08/11 4:45 PM
ORDER denying1 Motion to Seal Document2 Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 08/11/2015 (tlf).
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2015
5 5 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 08/10 2:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Telephone Conference held on 8/10/2015 re1 MOTION to Seal Document(s) filed by CHSPSC LLC. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. (esl)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/10 10:53 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHSPSC LLC identifying Corporate Parent COMMUNITY HEALTH SYSTEMS INC for CHSPSC LLC. (RAINS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2015
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/07 9:48 AM
Summonses issued as to ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC. (tlf)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility 1-Document Filed Under Seal - Also Select Doc to Seal Fri 08/07 9:43 AM
Sealed Complaint. Temporarily sealed pending Court's ruling (tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Letter Re: Proposed Acquisition
1 1 motion Seal Document(s) Fri 08/07 9:34 AM
MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal by CHSPSC LLC filed by EDWARD B. KRUGMAN, CHRISTOPHER T. GIOVINAZZO, and JOHN H. RAINS IV(tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher T. Giovinazzo,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Fri 08/07 10:12 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL EDWARD B KRUGMAN - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 08/07 10:14 AM
Filing Fee $400.00 paid, Receipt Number 113G-2140794 (tlf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 08/07 5:47 PM
NOTICE OF SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON MOTION re1 MOTION to Seal Document(s) : Telephone Conference set for 8/10/2015 02:00 PM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Participants should follow these instructions to connect to the call: Dial In #1-888-684-8852, enter Participant Access Code: 8469390. At the prompt, enter Security Code: 81015. (esl)
Related: [-]