Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Susan E Schwab
Case #: 1:15-cv-01543
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:332 Telecommunications Act
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2015
Terminated:Jan 13, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2016 8:59 AM EST
Defendant
Verde Energy USA, Inc.
Represented By
Peter J. Horne
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
Kevin P. Allen
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Crystal Stauffer
Represented By
Craig Thor Kimmel
Kimmel & Silverman
contact info
Tara L. Patterson
Kimmel & Silverman, P.C.
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
24 24 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 01/13 4:23 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation of dismissal23 , filed January 11, 2016, is APPROVED, and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 1/13/2016. (ktt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2016
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/11 11:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Crystal Stauffer. (Kimmel, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2016
22 22 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/07 3:05 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tara L. Patterson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 1/7/2016 (ktt)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/07 9:46 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Crystal Stauffer.(Patterson, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 07, 2015
19 19 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 12/07 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Patterson on behalf of Crystal Stauffer(Patterson, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, December 04, 2015
18 18 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/04 3:21 PM
ORDER: A Telephone Conference re. discovery status is set for 12/7/2015 @ 2:00 AM before MJ Susan E. Schwab. Cnsl for pltf shall initiate the call.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/4/15. (ma)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
17 17 order Special Admissions Form Approved ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 11/02 3:28 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew T. Thomasson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/2/2015. (ktt)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 11/02 4:50 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Thomasson & Associate Counsel Kimmel - Bar Status Verified. (ve)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/30 12:50 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney Andrew T. Thomasson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3587634. by Crystal Stauffer.(Thomasson, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2015
15 15 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 10/19 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Horne on behalf of Verde Energy USA, Inc. (Horne, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2015
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/09 8:41 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Verde Energy USA, Inc..(Allen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2015
13 13 order Case Management Order - Standard Track Tue 09/29 3:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - After a telephonic conference with counsel, IT IS ORDERED that the following case management order is entered in this matter. Joinder of Parties: January 8, 2016, Amendment of Pleadings: January 15, 2016, Close of (Fact) Discovery: February 1, 2016, Telephone Conference to Discuss Status: January 19, 2016, Reports of Experts: Plaintiff: March 1, 2016, Defendant: March 1, 2016, Supplements: April 1, 2016. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/29/2015. (ktt)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 09/29 3:38 PM
Set Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/19/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. (ktt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/24 3:45 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a case management conference is scheduled for, September 29, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. The conference will be by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call by calling Chambers after all counsel are on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/24/2015. (ktt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
10 10 order Order - Consent to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge Approved Tue 09/22 3:38 PM
ORDER: The captioned action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab.The case management conference scheduled for September 28, 2015, is CANCELLED.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/22/15. (ma)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 09/21 4:19 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Allen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/01 10:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER RESCHEDULING Initial Case Management Conference from 9/17/15 TO 9/28/2015 @ 10:00 AM. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/1/15. (ki)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2015
7 7 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/17 8:50 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2015 @ 10:00 AM - placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/17/15. (ki)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2015
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Fri 08/14 6:04 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Verde Energy USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verde Energy USA Holdings, LLC for Verde Energy USA, Inc.. (Allen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 08/14 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Allen on behalf of Verde Energy USA, Inc. (Allen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/14 12:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Crystal Stauffer. Verde Energy USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/10/2015, answer due 10/9/2015. (Kimmel, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2015
3 3 order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Fri 08/07 11:56 AM
ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/7/15. (ki)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/07 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Verde Energy USA, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/07 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Verde Energy USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-3508999) filed by Crystal Stauffer.(pjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet