Zloop Knitting Mill LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-11662 |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Zloop Knitting Mill LLC
816 13th St NE
Hickory, NC 28601-4133 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 12/28 2:19 PM
Order Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases Order Signed on 12/28/2016 (LMD) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 12/28 2:21 PM
Bankruptcy Case 15-11662 Closed (LMD) |
||
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Operating Report
Fri 07/08 3:53 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 1, 2016 through May 31, 2016 Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brogan, Daniel) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Operating Report
Fri 07/08 3:33 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 1, 2016 through April 30, 3016 Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brogan, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Operating Report
Mon 04/25 4:02 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 1, 2016 - March 31, 2016 Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Operating Report
Mon 04/25 4:02 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 1, 2016 - February 29, 2016 Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Tue 02/16 9:28 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Tue 02/16 9:26 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch E-F, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 01/29 11:57 AM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. [ZLOOP Knitting, LLC] Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 01/29 11:56 AM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch E-F, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. [ZLOOP Knitting, LLC] Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Operating Report
Fri 01/15 9:15 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 1, 2015 - November 30, 2015 Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Operating Report
Tue 09/22 7:03 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 10, 2015 - August 31, 2015 Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brogan, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 09/09 8:59 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brogan, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 09/09 8:58 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brogan, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 08/11 11:37 AM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of ZLOOP Inc., ZLOOP Nevada, LLC and ZLOOP Knitting Mill, LLC. All further pleadings and other papers in this Chapter 11 Case shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, Case No. 15-11660 (KJC) (ZLOOP, Inc., et al.).Nothing contained in the Motion or this Order shall be deemed or construed as directing or otherwise effectuating a substantive consolidation of the above captioned chapter 11 cases. Order Signed on 8/11/2015 (LMD) |
|
Sunday, August 09, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration - Motion
Sun 08/09 4:46 PM
Motion for Joint Administration - Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Directing the Joint Administration of Their Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Zloop Knitting Mill LLC(Brogan, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Sun 08/09 3:51 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-11662 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7677340, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 08/09 3:49 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - Zloop Knitting Mill LLC . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Zloop Knitting Mill LLC. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 08/10 8:29 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (AK) |