New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:15-cv-06432
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2015
Terminated:Nov 18, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 10, 2016 9:59 AM EST
Defendant
Sarma Melngailis
Defendant
One Lucky Duck Ecommerce, LLC
Defendant
One Lucky Duck Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Pure Food and Wine, LLC
Defendant
CGM 54 Irving, LLC
Plaintiff
Andrew Elliot
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
NeNe Diane
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rayshawn Ware
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua T. Richards
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeferson Restrepo
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Paredes
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dylan Martin
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Caetano Laprebendere
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Giselle Jett
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Noe S Hernandez
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lauren Haupt
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Red Grayson
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica Graff
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Eduardo Garcia
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Liana Felt
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Edie DiMauro
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Cordiliko
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Woods
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Schubmehl
Represented By
Benjamin Nathan Dictor
Eisner & Mirer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 04, 2019
100 100 misc Proposed Abstract of Judgment Thu 04/04 1:25 PM
PROPOSED ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16621878. Abstract of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by Anthony Cordiliko, Edie DiMauro, NeNe Diane, Andrew Elliot, Liana Felt, Pedro Fernandez, Eduardo Garcia, Erica Graff, Erin Red Grayson, Lauren Haupt, Noe S Hernandez, Giselle Jett, Caetano Laprebendere, Dylan Martin, Eric Paredes, Jeferson Restrepo, Joshua T. Richards, Daniel Schubmehl, Rayshawn Ware, Kevin Woods. Document Number of Related Judgment:99 . (Dictor, Benjamin) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
misc Abstract of Judgment Issued Thu 04/04 3:54 PM
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT issued on April 4, 2019, in favor of Daniel Schubmehl, Kevin Woods, Anthony Cordiliko, Edie DiMauro, Diane Nene, Andrew Elliot, Liana Felt, Pedro Fernandez, Eduardo Garcia, Erica Graff, Erin Red Grayson, Lauren Haupt, Noe S. Hernandez, Giselle Jett, Caetano Laprebendere, Dylan Martin, Eric Paredes, Jeferson Restrepo, Joshua T. Richards, Rayshawn Ware and against Sarma Melngailis in the amount of $18,027.03 Abstract of Judgment mailed by the Court. (km)
Related: [-]