Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:C Darnell Jones, II
Case #: 2:15-cv-04776
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2015
Re-opened:Jul 26, 2016
Terminated:Jul 26, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 17, 2016 9:37 AM EST
Defendant
DELILAH'S DEN OF ATLANTIC CITY
Represented By
JONATHAN S. KRAUSE
Klehr Harrsion Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
CARIANNE P. TORRISSI
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
DELILAH'S DEN OF PHILADELPHIA, INC.
Represented By
JONATHAN S. KRAUSE
Klehr Harrsion Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
CARIANNE P. TORRISSI
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
DELILAH'S DEN OF PLEASANTVILLE
Defendant
JEM HOSPITALITY, INC.
Represented By
JONATHAN S. KRAUSE
Klehr Harrsion Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
CARIANNE P. TORRISSI
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
JENNIFER SHAMY
Represented By
STEPHEN M. HOWARD
contact info
Defendant
SPRING GARDEN SOCIAL CLUB, INC.
Represented By
JONATHAN S. KRAUSE
Klehr Harrsion Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
CARIANNE P. TORRISSI
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Plaintiff
CARLEE COSTELLO
Represented By
DMITRY A. BRAYNIN
Kalikhman & Rayz LLC
contact info
ARKADY ERIC RAYZ
Kalikhman & Rayz LLC
contact info
GERALD D. WELLS, III
Connolly Wells & Gray, LLP
contact info
Unrepresented Party
DELILAH'S DEN OF PLEASANTVILLE


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
23 23 order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 07/26 3:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/26/16. 7/26/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 07/01 12:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CARLEE COSTELLO. (WELLS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
21 21 order Suspense Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/15 2:41 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN 5/6/2016.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/15/2016. 4/15/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(kp, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2016
20 20 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 03/15 11:21 AM
ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 3/17/16 AT 9:30 A.M. IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 3/14/16. 3/15/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(gs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 02/04 9:40 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/17/16 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3-E. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/3/16. 2/4/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
18 18 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Scheduling Order Thu 12/17 1:55 PM
ORDER THAT THE FIRST PHASE OF DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/14/16. THIS CASE SHALL BE REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI8 FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 4/14/16. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION SHALL BE FILED BY 4/30/16. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/14/15. 12/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
17 17 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 12/15 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for Pretrial Conference held on 12/14/15 before Judge Jones (mbh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2015
16 16 discov Discovery Plan Mon 12/07 4:44 PM
Discovery Plan by CARLEE COSTELLO.(RAYZ, ARKADY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2015
15 15 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/05 10:05 AM
ORDER THAT A FRCP 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 12/14/2015 AT 10:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/4/15. 11/5/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/02 4:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by JENNIFER SHAMY.(HOWARD, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/02 2:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, together with and Separate Defenses by DELILAH'S DEN OF ATLANTIC CITY, DELILAH'S DEN OF PHILADELPHIA, INC., JEM HOSPITALITY, INC., SPRING GARDEN SOCIAL CLUB, INC..(KRAUSE, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 19, 2015
12 12 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 10/19 1:10 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SPRING GARDEN SOCIAL CLUB, INC..(KRAUSE, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
11 11 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 10/19 1:09 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JEM HOSPITALITY, INC..(KRAUSE, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
10 10 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 10/19 1:07 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DELILAH'S DEN OF PHILADELPHIA, INC..(KRAUSE, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
9 9 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 10/19 1:06 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DELILAH'S DEN OF ATLANTIC CITY.(KRAUSE, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/06 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CARIANNE P. TORRISSI on behalf of DELILAH'S DEN OF ATLANTIC CITY, DELILAH'S DEN OF PHILADELPHIA, INC., JEM HOSPITALITY, INC., SPRING GARDEN SOCIAL CLUB, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRISSI, CARIANNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 05, 2015
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/05 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN M. HOWARD on behalf of JENNIFER SHAMY with Certificate of Service(HOWARD, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/02 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE on behalf of DELILAH'S DEN OF ATLANTIC CITY, DELILAH'S DEN OF PHILADELPHIA, INC., JEM HOSPITALITY, INC., SPRING GARDEN SOCIAL CLUB, INC. (KRAUSE, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2015
5 5 order Order Setting Answer Deadline Fri 10/02 11:37 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL ON OR BEFORE 11/2/15 TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE WITH RESPECT TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/30/15. 10/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
service Alias Summons Issued Wed 09/02 10:18 AM
Alias Summons Issued as to DELILAHS DEN OF PHILADELPHIA, INC. D/B/A DELILAHS DEN, DELILAHS DEN OF PLEASANTVILLE F/D/B/A DELILAHS DEN, DELILAHS DEN OF ATLANTIC CITY D/B/A DELILAHS DEN, SPRING GARDEN SOCIAL CLUB, INC. D/B/A ZEE BAR, JEM HOSPITALITY, INC. D/B/A REBEL ROCK & BAR and JENNIFER SHAMY. (mbh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
4 4 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 09/01 10:38 AM
Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons by CARLEE COSTELLO. (BRAYNIN, DMITRY)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/01 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DMITRY A. BRAYNIN on behalf of CARLEE COSTELLO (BRAYNIN, DMITRY)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/28 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD D. WELLS, III on behalf of CARLEE COSTELLO (WELLS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/24 8:54 AM
COMPLAINT against DELILAH'S DEN OF ATLANTIC CITY, DELILAH'S DEN OF PHILADELPHIA, INC., DELILAH'S DEN OF PLEASANTVILLE, JEM HOSPITALITY, INC., JENNIFER SHAMY, SPRING GARDEN SOCIAL CLUB, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 126421.), filed by CARLEE COSTELLO.(jwl, )
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 08/24 8:55 AM
Summons Issued as to DELILAH'S DEN OF ATLANTIC CITY, DELILAH'S DEN OF PHILADELPHIA, INC., DELILAH'S DEN OF PLEASANTVILLE, JEM HOSPITALITY, INC., JENNIFER SHAMY, SPRING GARDEN SOCIAL CLUB, INC.. Six Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/21/15 (jwl, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 08/24 8:56 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CARLEE COSTELLO. (jwl, )
Related: [-]