ZLOOP, Inc. v. Recycling Equipment, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-51174 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Recycling Equipment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ZLOOP, Inc.
816 13th Street NE
Hickory, NC 28601 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/21 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/20/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Transcript
Mon 04/18 12:07 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 3/31/16 RE: Status. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/18/2016. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, LLC, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/25/2016. Redaction Request Due By 5/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/19/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/18/2016. (Murin, Leslie) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/31 7:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-51174 Closed (LCo) |
||
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Wed 03/30 4:03 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Between ZLOOP, Inc. and Recycling Equipment, Inc. . Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 03/29 10:33 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/31/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 10/14 2:23 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Debtors and Recycling Equipment Regarding Standstill Order Signed on 10/14/2015. (LMD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "1" | ||
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Tue 10/13 6:15 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Extending Time in Adversary Proceeding Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Form of Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Brief
Mon 09/28 4:32 PM
Opening Brief in Support of Motion of Recycling Equipment, Inc. for the Entry of An Order Dismissing Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Filed by Recycling Equipment, Inc.. (Hazeltine, William) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion
Mon 09/28 4:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Recycling Equipment, Inc. . (Hazeltine, William) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 09/08 4:34 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Recycling Equipment, Inc. (Hazeltine, William) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 09/03 4:24 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by ZLOOP, Inc. (Hatcher, Laura) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Thu 08/27 6:35 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Recycling Equipment, Inc.. Answer due date: 09/28/2015. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 08/27 6:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-51174 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7700823, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 08/27 6:25 PM
Adversary case 15-51174 Complaint for Turnover of Property to the Plaintiff by ZLOOP, Inc. against Recycling Equipment, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/28/2015. (Brown, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |