Wallace v. Group Long Term Disability Pla
Original Case: 1:13-cv-06759
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-02860 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 08, 2016 7:05 PM EST |
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of TDAmeritrade Holding Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Pamela Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/08/2016 6:14 PM EST |
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Wallace, FILED. [1595665] 15-2860 [Entered: 09/10/2015 04:29 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 08/11/2015, RECEIVED.[1595670] 15-2860 [Entered: 09/10/2015 04:31 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/11/2015, RECEIVED.[1595672] 15-2860 [Entered: 09/10/2015 04:32 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1595674] 15-2860 [Entered: 09/10/2015 04:32 PM] | |
5 | 5 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Wallace, FILED. No Service.[1595675] 15-2860 [Entered: 09/10/2015 04:34 PM] | |
6 | 6 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [5], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Wallace, FILED.[1595679] 15-2860 [Entered: 09/10/2015 04:35 PM] | |
7 | 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[1595685] 15-2860 [Entered: 09/10/2015 04:38 PM] |