Crosby v. University of Kentucky
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph M Hood |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-00276 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 14, 2016 8:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Terry Allen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eli Capilouto
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PHD, CIH Wayne T. Sanderson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Thro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PHD Timothy Tracy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard A. Crosby
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
University of Kentucky
Terminated: 10/13/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
![]() LETTER from Supreme Court: Petition for writ of certiorari is denied. (GLD) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
![]() LETTER from SCOTUS: petition for a writ of certiorari filed on November 9, 2017 and placed on the docket November 15, 2017 as No. 17-723. (STC) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
![]() MANDATE of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard A. Crosby(STC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
![]() INFORMATION COPY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard A. Crosby AFFIRMED. Mandate to issue(STC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 10/27 3:04 PM
USCA Case Number 16-6598 Case Manager Linda Niesen for24 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard A. Crosby. (STC) |
||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to23 Judgment, by Richard A. Crosby. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0643-3624866. (Brown, Kent) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
![]() JUDGMENT: (1) all claims in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (2) all scheduled proceedings and deadlines are CONTINUED GENERALLY; (3) this is a FINAL AND APPEALABLE judgment and there is no just cause for delay; and (4) Clerk shall STRIKE THIS MATTER FROM THE ACTIVE DOCKET. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/3/2016.(STC) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Injunction1 is DENIED AS MOOT; (2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss4 is DENIED AS MOOT; (3) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss12 is GRANTED; (4) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Oversized Memorandum15 is GRANTED; and (5) Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing17 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/30/2016. (STC) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE OF FILING by Richard A. Crosby(Brown, Kent) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 01/06 8:55 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re12 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Terry Allen, Eli Capilouto, Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Timothy Tracy (STC) |
||
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Terry Allen, Eli Capilouto, Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Timothy Tracy filed by Terry Allen, Eli Capilouto, Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Timothy Tracy. (Beauman, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Agreed Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 12/16 10:25 AM
VIRTUAL ORDER granting18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss . Replies due by 1/5/2016. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/16/2015.(STC) |
|
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 12/16 8:46 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by Terry Allen, Eli Capilouto, Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Timothy Tracy, Richard A. Crosby (STC) |
||
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by Terry Allen, Eli Capilouto, Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Timothy Tracy. (Beauman, Bryan) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MOTION for Hearing re16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Richard A. Crosby(Brown, Kent) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() TENDERED RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Terry Allen, Eli Capilouto, Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Timothy Tracy filed by Richard A. Crosby.(Brown, Kent) Modified on 12/4/2015 (STC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION for Leave to File by Richard A. Crosby Oversized Memorandum(Brown, Kent) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Fri 12/04 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Kent Brown re16 Response in Opposition to Motion. Error: This pleading was not filed as an attachment to15 motion for leave to file oversized memorandum. Correction: the clerk tendered the Response. An electronically submitted document requiring leave of Court shall be filed as an attachment to the motion and not as a separate entry. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (STC) |
||
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Agreed Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/10 11:35 AM
VIRTUAL ORDER granting13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time . Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due by 12/4/2015. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/10/2015.(STC) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time by Richard A. Crosby, Terry Allen, Dr. Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Dr. Timothy Tracy, Dr. Eli Capilouto. (Brown, Kent) Modified on 11/10/2015 (STC) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Terry Allen, Eli Capilouto, Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Timothy Tracy(Beauman, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard A. Crosby via Direct Express courier to Terry Allen served on 10/14/2015, answer due 11/4/2015; Eli Capilouto served on 10/14/2015, answer due 11/4/2015; Wayne T. Sanderson served on 10/14/2015, answer due 11/4/2015; William Thro served on 10/14/2015, answer due 11/4/2015; Timothy Tracy served on 10/14/2015, answer due 11/4/2015. (Brown, Kent) |
|
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 10/21 10:00 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Richard A. Crosby (STC) |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Wed 10/14 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Kent Brown re7 Amended Document. Error 1 : the amended complaint was incorrectly filed using the event "amended document." Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the docket text of7 to state, "incorrectly filed." Clerk filed the amended complaint as9 ; In the future, contact the ECF help desk when assistance is needed to select the correct event. Error 2 : attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit One," "Exhibit Two." Correction: Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Ex: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (STC) |
||
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to Eli Capilouto, Richard A. Crosby, Wayne T. Sanderson, William Thro, Timothy Tracy; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (STC) |
|
9 | 9
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eli Capilouto, Timothy Tracy, William Thro, Wayne T. Sanderson, Terry Allen, filed by Richard A. Crosby. Filed pursuant to QC of7 .(STC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF FILING by Richard A. Crosby re7 Amended Document, VERIFIED AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT (Brown, Kent) |
|
7 | 7
![]() AMENDED DOCUMENT by Richard A. Crosby. VERIFIED AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT .(Brown, Kent) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER: The hearing scheduled for October 13, 2015 is CONTINUED pending further orders of the Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on October 9, 2015.(AWD) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Richard A. Crosby filed by University of Kentucky.(Beauman, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by University of Kentucky , MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by University of Kentucky(Beauman, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/25 3:25 PM
ORDER: MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Richard A. Crosby is set for MOTION HEARING on 10/13/2015 at 2:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/25/2015.(STC) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Fri 09/25 3:24 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting [] Motion for Leave to file oversized memorandum. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/25/2015. (STC) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 15-CI-3289. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3307019), filed by University of Kentucky.(STC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
motion
For Leave
Wed 09/16 4:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to file oversized memorandum by Richard A. Crosby. Motion filed in state court and attached herein at1 . (STC) |
||
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 09/16 4:39 PM
MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Richard A. Crosby. Motion filed in state court and attached herein at1 . (STC) Modified on 9/16/2015 (STC) |
||
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Wed 09/16 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re MOTION for Leave by Richard A. Crosby ; Error: Motion entered incorrectly; Entry by docket clerk; Correction: Incorrect entry deleted and motion re-filed without docket entry number; No action required by counsel. cc: COR (STC) |
||
misc
Conflict Check
Wed 09/16 4:42 PM
Conflict Check run. (STC) |