Samson Lone Star, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-11934
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-11934
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-11941 |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | More than $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Samson Lone Star, LLC
2 W 2nd St
Tulsa, OK 74103-3123 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 02/23 9:37 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SJS) |
||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Order Approving Motion For Final Decree. Signed on 2/22/2018 (SJS) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Wise County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Wise County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Rusk County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Rusk County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Marion County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Franklin County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Franklin County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch E-F, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Samson Lone Star, LLC. (Yurkewicz, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): claim #2776 with claim agent . Filed by Smith County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Withdrawal now filed under lead case Filed by Beckville isd. (Weller, Helen) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. has withdrawn from the case. Filed by Dallas County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Appearance. Filed by Dallas County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Beckville isd. (Weller, Helen) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Withdrawal of Claim #2755 in the amount of $3,262.73 . Filed by Montgomery County. (Dillman, John) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Withdrawal of Claim(s): . Filed by Gregg County. (Weller, Helen) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim (original sent to claims agent) Filed by Helene Lagrone. (Kiem, Tarek) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Ward County, Ector CAD. (Aelvoet, David) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Samson Lone Star LLC 15-11941 Filed by Samson Lone Star, LLC. (Yurkewicz, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Samson Lone Star, LLC 15-11941 Filed by Samson Lone Star, LLC. (Yurkewicz, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of : Geodyne Resources, Inc., Case No. 15-11935 Samson Contour Energy Co., Case No. 15-11936 Samson Contour Energy E&P, LLC, Case No. 15-11937 Samson Holdings, Inc., Case No. 15-11938 Samson- International, Ltd., Case No. 15-11939 Samson Investment Company, Case No. 15-11940 Samson Lone Star, LLC, Case No. 15-11941 Samson Resources Company, Case No. 15-11942 and Samson Resources Corporation, Case No. 15-11934 All Further Pleadings and other papers shall be filed in all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 15-11934 Signed on 9/18/2015 (NAB) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/17 6:51 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-11941 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7724902, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Geodyne Resources, Inc., Samson Contour Energy Co., Samson Contour Energy E&P, LLC, Samson Holdings, Inc., Samson Investment Company, Samson Lone Star, LLC, Samson Resources Company, Samson Resources Corporation, Samson-International, Ltd.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Thu 09/17 8:11 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (BA) |
||
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Samson Lone Star, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) |