Sehr et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie L White |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-01436 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 16, 2016 9:51 AM CDT |
Defendant
Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Manser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dylan Sehr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Sehr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 12/15 4:05 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 15, 2016. (BRP) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Stipulation
Wed 12/14 3:24 PM
STIPULATION re14 Amended Complaint,40 Order,, for Dismissal by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 12/09 10:06 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Mon 10/24 1:53 PM
ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the trial scheduled for March 6, 2017 is VACATED, and all pending motions are denied with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 12/8/2016.). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/24/2016. (NEB) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
adr
ADR Compliance Report
Fri 10/21 4:20 PM
ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Sher, Richard P.. Date of Conference: October 20, 2016. The parties participated in good faith. The parties achieved a settlement.(Sher, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
adr
Notice of Appointment of Neutral
Tue 10/18 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Sher, Richard P. Neutral selected by parties. (cc: Neutral)(KCB) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 08/25 7:38 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Completion Deadline for ADR Referral [ECF No. 36] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the ADR conference shall be concluded before October 21, 2016. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/25/16. (ALM) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Extension
Wed 08/24 2:19 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of: Completion Deadline for ADR Referral by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order Referring Case to ADR
Tue 07/19 4:18 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Rabeeh A. Lutfiyya ADR Completion Deadline due by 9/14/2016. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 9/28/2016. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 8/24/2016. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on July 19, 2016. (BRP) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 07/12 8:23 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Answer out of Time [ECF No. 33] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/12/16. (ALM) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Leave to
Mon 07/11 1:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Counts VII, VIII and IX to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Out of Time and Combined Memorandum in Support by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Gustafson, Jennifer) |
|
32 | 32
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/11 1:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint to Counts VII, VIII and IX by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Gustafson, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
7
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Thu 06/23 11:51 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF No.19 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF No.20 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Petition and Motion to Strike Petition (ECF Nos.9 ,10 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 06/23/2016. (KCB) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Protective Order
Wed 05/18 2:58 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 05/18/2016. (KCB) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Protective Order
Tue 05/17 3:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Gustafson, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulated Protective Order | ||
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 11/16 11:58 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION to Strike14 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 11/16 11:57 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss :First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
order
Case Management Order
Thu 11/12 3:02 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 2/26/2016. Discovery Completion due by 10/21/2016. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2016. ADR Future Reference 8/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 10/28/2016. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 2/14/2017. Motion in Limine due by 2/24/2017. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/12/2015. (NEB) |
|
25 | 25
minutes
Rule 16 Conference
Thu 11/12 2:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Ronnie L. White: Rule 16 Conference held on 11/12/2015. Conference held in person. CMO to issue. (FTR Gold: No.) (NEB) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 11/05 12:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Strike14 Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 11/05 12:56 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss :First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Joint Scheduling Plan
Thu 11/05 12:51 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. . (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 10/29 4:26 PM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint, by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Strike
Thu 10/29 4:25 PM
MOTION to Strike14 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss (other than a party or the case)
Thu 10/29 4:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss :First Amended Complaint by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 10/26 7:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Strike6 Petition and Combined Memorandum In Support filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 10/26 7:18 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Combined Memorandum In Support filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/16 9:35 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Strike6 Petition and Combined Memorandum In Support filed by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 10/16 9:33 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Combined Memorandum In Support filed by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 10/16 8:58 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Amendment to6 Petition No Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued No, Consents issued No, Jury demand, , filed by Dylan Sehr, William Manser, Elizabeth Sehr. Related document:6 Petition filed by Elizabeth Sehr, Dylan Sehr, William Manser.(Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Rule 16 Order
Thu 10/15 4:27 PM
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/5/2015. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/15/2015. (NEB) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 10/07 10:06 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs William Manser, Dylan Sehr, Elizabeth Sehr. (Lutfiyya, Rabeeh) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/25 7:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Strike
Fri 09/25 7:28 PM
MOTION to Strike6 Petition and Combined Memorandum In Support by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 09/25 7:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case and Combined Memorandum In Support by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 09/24 12:00 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file under seal Exhibits A and B attached to Document No. 3, not Document No. 1 indicated in the previous Order, as Document No. 1 contains the redacted Exhibits. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/24/15. (ALM) |
|
7 | 7
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 09/24 9:59 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Leave to File under Seal [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall file under seal Exhibits A and B attached to Document No. 1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall filed redacted copies of Exhibits A and B pursuant to E.D. Mo. L.R. 2.17 no later than October 2, 2015. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/24/15. (ALM) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Fri 09/18 2:28 PM
Petition Received From: Circuit Court, St. Francois County, Missouri, filed by Dylan Sehr, William Manser, Elizabeth Sehr.(BAK) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 09/18 1:51 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer L Gustafson for Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Gustafson, Jennifer) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Fri 09/18 1:48 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 09/18 1:47 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits to Notice of Removal (Exhibit A) and by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings .(Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B | ||
2 | 2
motion
For Leave to File Sealed Document
Fri 09/18 1:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Caradonna, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Fri 09/18 1:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Francois County, State of Missouri, case number 15SF-CC00157, Jury Demand,, filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Caradonna, Thomas) (JWD) |
|
Att: 1 25 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 4 (9/18/2015) Original Filing Form | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Fri 09/18 2:31 PM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK) |