Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-02230

Mississippi Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Edward Ellington
Case #: 3:15-ap-00078
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2015
Terminated:Jun 04, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Eric Rivers
1138 Cox Ferry Road
Flora, MS 39071
Represented By
James Eric Rivers
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Lott Walker
Represented By
Derek L Hall
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Cline Walker
333 Wilmington Street
Jackson, MS 39204
Represented By
Derek L Hall
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Layne Hall
1911 Dunbarton Drive
Jackson, MS 39216
Represented By
Derek L Hall
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert H. Walker
Represented By
Derek L Hall
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey B. McGuire
Represented By
Derek L Hall
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebel High Velocity Sewer Services
Represented By
Derek L Hall
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Walker Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By
Derek L Hall
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
Represented By
Derek L Hall
Derek L. Hall, PLLC
contact info
Trustee
Derek A Henderson T1
1765-A Lelia Drive Suite 103
Jackson, MS 39216
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
501 East Court Street Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, June 04, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/04 9:22 AM
Adversary Case 3:15-ap-78 Closed. Disposition of Adversary: Agreed Order (ore tenus) Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
37 37 court Returned Mail Thu 05/17 4:15 PM
Returned Mail for James Eric Rivers, 1138 Cox Ferry Road, Flora, MS 39071-944 Related [+]. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-] 34 Agreed Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, May 10, 2018
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/11 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Agreed Order (ore tenus)
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
34 34 order Agreed Order (ore tenus) Tue 05/08 9:11 AM
Agreed Order (ore tenus) Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Agreed Order (ore tenus) Tue 05/08 9:06 AM
Agreed Order (ore tenus) Allowing Withdrawal of Counsel. Derek L. Hall, Esq. is allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for all Plaintiffs. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Setting Aside Tue 05/08 9:03 AM
Order Setting Aside Agreed Order Holding Adversary in Abeyance Related [+]. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-] 19 Agreed Order Holding Matters in Abeyance
31 31 notice Notice (generic) Tue 05/08 8:16 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. McGuire. (McGuire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
28 28 notice Notice of Status Conference Mon 04/02 11:48 AM
Notice of Status Conference Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 5/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 4D - Ellington - Jackson. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant James Eric Rivers,15 Response filed by Plaintiff Derek Layne Hall, Plaintiff Deborah Lott Walker, Plaintiff Andrew Cline Walker, Plaintiff Robert H. Walker, Interested Party Jeffrey B. McGuire, Plaintiff Jeffrey B. McGuire, Plaintiff Rebel High Velocity Sewer Services, Plaintiff Walker Environmental Services, Inc., Plaintiff Derek L. Hall, PLLC
Thursday, March 09, 2017
24 24 notice Notice of Status Conference Thu 03/09 2:33 PM
Notice of Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 4/25/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 4D - Jackson. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
22 22 court Action Required Wed 10/05 10:40 AM
Request to D. Hall, J. McGuire and M. Bolen for Status Update as to State Court Litigation - Action Required . Related [+] Tickle for date: 10/19/2016. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-] 19 Agreed Order Holding Adversary in Abeyance
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/10 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Agreed Order (ore tenus)
Monday, March 07, 2016
19 19 2 pgs order Agreed Order (ore tenus) Mon 03/07 11:31 AM
Agreed Order (ore tenus) Holding Adversary in Abeyance Related [+]
Related: [-] uments:1 ,11 and15 . (McDowell, K
Thursday, January 07, 2016
17 17 order Set/Reset/Continue Hearing Thu 01/07 11:57 AM
Order Resetting Status Conference. Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 3/8/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 4D - Jackson. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Status Conference
Monday, December 21, 2015
15 15 answer Response Mon 12/21 2:25 PM
Response to Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Or, In The Alternative, For Additional Time to Answer Filed by Plaintiffs Derek L. Hall, PLLC, Derek Layne Hall, Jeffrey B. McGuire, Rebel High Velocity Sewer Services, Andrew Cline Walker, Deborah Lott Walker, Robert H. Walker, Walker Environmental Services, Inc. (Hall, Derek)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Response Mon 12/21 2:23 PM
DISREGARD - TO BE REFILED IN MAIN CASE Response to Motion to Strike Filed by Plaintiffs Derek L. Hall, PLLC, Derek Layne Hall, Jeffrey B. McGuire, Rebel High Velocity Sewer Services, Andrew Cline Walker, Deborah Lott Walker, Robert H. Walker, Walker Environmental Services, Inc. (Hall, Derek) Modified on 12/22/2015 Notified D. Hall via email that pleading needs to be refiled in Main Case 15-2230 (McDowell, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
13 13 notice Notice of Status Conference Mon 12/14 2:42 PM
Notice of Status Conference Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 1/7/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 4D - Jackson. (McDowell, K)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or, in the Alternative, for Additional Time to File anAnswer filed by Defendant James Eric Rivers
Saturday, December 12, 2015
11 11 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Sat 12/12 2:12 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or, in the Alternative, for Additional Time to file an Answer. Filed by Defendant James Eric Rivers (Bolen, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 3:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on James Eric Rivers 11/24/2015 (Hall, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2015
9 9 court Action Required Mon 11/23 11:07 AM
Clerk's Notice to Derek Hall, Esq. - Action Required: Proof of Service of Summons/Certificate of Service Needs to be Filed on Docket . Related [+] Tickle for date: 11/30/2015. (McDowell, Kimber)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued
Sunday, November 15, 2015
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/16 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued
Friday, November 13, 2015
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 11/13 12:46 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to Rule 7007.1. Filed by Plaintiffs Derek L. Hall, PLLC, Derek Layne Hall, Jeffrey B. McGuire, Rebel High Velocity Sewer Services, Andrew Cline Walker, Deborah Lott Walker, Robert H. Walker, Walker Environmental Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Hall, Derek)
Related: [-] 4 Notice to file Corporate Ownership Statement
6 6 misc Adversary Cover Sheet B104 Fri 11/13 12:36 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet B104 Filed by Plaintiffs Derek L. Hall, PLLC, Derek Layne Hall, Jeffrey B. McGuire, Rebel High Velocity Sewer Services, Andrew Cline Walker, Deborah Lott Walker, Robert H. Walker, Walker Environmental Services, Inc.. (Hall, Derek)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Summons Issued Fri 11/13 8:33 AM
Summons Issued via ECF email notification to Derek L. Hall, Esq. for service of Summons on James Eric Rivers Date Issued 11/13/2015, Answer Due 12/14/2015. Note: Attorney of Record from Debtor in Main Case is R. Michael Bolen, Esq. (McDowell, Kimber)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice to File Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 11/13 8:29 AM
Notice to Derek L. Hall, Esq. to File Corporate Ownership Statement. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 11/16/2015. (McDowell, Kimber)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice to File Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 11/13 8:23 AM
Notice to Derek L. Hall, Esq. to file Adversary Cover Sheet. Related [+] (McDowell, Kimber)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Derek Layne Hall, Plaintiff Deborah Lott Walker, Plaintiff Andrew Cline Walker, Plaintiff Robert H. Walker, Plaintiff Jeffrey B. McGuire, Plaintiff Rebel High Velocity Sewer Services, Plaintiff Walker Environmental Services, Inc., Plaintiff Derek L. Hall, PLLC
court Case Assigned Fri 11/13 7:55 AM
Judge Edward Ellington added to case (Wright, Terry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2015
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 11/12 6:18 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-00078 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7649543. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/12 6:16 PM
Adversary case 15-00078 (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)),62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)): Complaint by Derek L Hall on behalf of Deborah Lott Walker, Andrew Cline Walker, Derek Layne Hall, Robert H. Walker, Jeffrey B. McGuire, Rebel High Velocity Sewer Services, Walker Environmental Services, Derek L. Hall, PLLC against James Eric Rivers. Fee Amount $350 (Hall, Derek)
Related: [-]