Washington Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:15-cr-06044
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2015
Terminated:Dec 21, 2017
Last checked: Sunday May 01, 2016 7:37 PM PDT
Defendant
Donald Holmes (1)
Represented By
Mark J O'Brien
O'Brien Hatfield PA
contact info
Souphavady Bounlutay
Bounlutay Law Firm Ps
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam Clay Cullman
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Mary Katherine Dimke
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Scott Travis Jones
U S Attorney'S Office - Spo
contact info
Karla Gebel Perrin
contact info

GPO Sep 06 2016
PETITION/ORDER as to Donald Holmes (1) Re Pretrial Release Violation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AY, Case Administrator)
GPO Dec 20 2017
ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Donald Holmes (1). Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator)
GPO Dec 21 2017
JUDGMENT as to Donald Holmes (1), Counts 1 and 2 of the Information, Imprisonment: 78 months with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. To be served concurrent with each other for a total term of imprisonment of 78 months; Supervised Release: 3 years with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. To be served concurrently with each other for a total term of Supervised Release of 3 years; SPA: $100.00 with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 for a total of $200.00; Restitution: $15,693,341.67; Fine: Waived. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator)
GPO Jun 28 2018
1ST AMENDED JUDGMENT re 73 Judgment as to Donald Holmes (1) - Modification of Restitution Order, Counts 1 and 2 of the Information, Imprisonment: 78 months with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. To be served concurrent with each other for a total term of imprisonment of 78 months; Supervised Release: 3 years with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. To be served concurrently with each other for a total term of Supervised Release of 3 years; SPA: $100.00 with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 for a total of $200.00; Restitution: $15,686,697.57; Fine: Waived. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator) Modified on 6/28/2018 (PL, Case Administrator).
GPO Jan 29 2020
SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT re 76 Amended Judgment as to Donald Holmes (1). Modification of Restitution Order, Counts 1, 2, Imprisonment: 78 months with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. To be served concurrent with each other for a total term of imprisonment of 78 months; Supervised Release: 3 years with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. To be served concurrently with each other for a total term of Supervised Release of 3 years; SPA: $100.00 with respect to each of Counts 1 and 2 for a total of $200.00; Restitution: $15,686,697.57; Fine: Waived. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator)

Docket last updated: 03/10/2024 12:46 PM PDT
Monday, November 23, 2015
1 1 INFORMATION as to Donald Holmes - Counts 1 and 2. (CV, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
2 2 Penalty Slip - FORFEITURE NOTICE - as to Donald Holmes (CV, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]