National Abortion Federation v. Center for Medical Progress, et al
Original Case: 3:15-cv-03522
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-17318 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 08, 2016 3:32 PM PST |
Defendant - Appellant
CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
BIOMAX PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DAVID DALEIDEN, AKA Robert Daoud Sarkis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
TROY NEWMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION, NAF
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/08/2016 2:24 PM PST |
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/02/2015. Transcript ordered by 12/28/2015. Transcript due 01/25/2016. Appellants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden and Troy Newman opening brief due 03/04/2016. Appellee National Abortion Federation answering brief due 04/04/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9771234] (RT) [Entered: 11/25/2015 02:03 PM] | |
2 | 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James Bopp, Jr. for Appellants Center for Medical Progress, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, David Daleiden and Troy Newman. Date of service: 11/25/2015. [9771362] 15-17318 (Bopp, James) [Entered: 11/25/2015 02:41 PM] | |
3 | 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Corrine Lorraine Purvis for Appellants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden and Troy Newman. Date of service: 11/25/2015. [9771375] 15-17318 (Bopp, James) [Entered: 11/25/2015 02:43 PM] | |
4 | 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress, David Daleiden and Troy Newman EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 11/25/2015. [9771414] 15-17318 (Bopp, James) [Entered: 11/25/2015 02:51 PM] | |
5 | 5 Added attorney James Bopp Jr. for David Daleiden Troy Newman Center for Medical Progress Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, in case 15-17318 [9771430] (CW) [Entered: 11/25/2015 02:57 PM] | |
6 | 6 Added attorney Corrine Lorraine Purvis for David Daleiden Troy Newman Center for Medical Progress Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, in case 15-17318 [9771440] (CW) [Entered: 11/25/2015 02:58 PM] | |
7 | 7 Filed (ECF) Appellee National Abortion Federation Correspondence: Letter requesting that pursuant to the Ninth Circuits General Orders the appeal and petition for writ of mandamus for this case be assigned to the original panel for review.. Date of service: 11/25/2015 [9771635] 15-17318 (Foran, Derek) [Entered: 11/25/2015 04:28 PM] |