National Abortion Federation v. Center for Medical Progress et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-03522 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 27, 2016 5:00 AM PST |
Amicus
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press 1156 15th St. NW Suite 1250
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Arizona
Office of the Attorney General 1275 W. Washington St.
Phoenix, AZ 85007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomax Procurement Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Center for Medical Progress
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Daleiden
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Troy Newman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood: Shasta-Diablo, Inc. dba Planned Parenthood Northern California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood/Orange and San Bernardino Counties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood of Santa Barbara, Ventura and San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood Pasadena and San Gabriel Valley, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Abortion Federation
|
Represented By
|
Witness
Charles C Johnson
|
Represented By
|
1. | What happens if you take the Fifth in a civil case? (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Sun 08/30/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
871 | 871
order
Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Mon 06/03 1:41 PM
Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying 827 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in light of Order at Dkt. No. 866. These filings will be unsealed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (COURT STAFF) |
|
870 | 870
order
Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Mon 06/03 1:40 PM
Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying 838 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in light of Order at Dkt. No. 866. These filings will be unsealed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (COURT STAFF) |
|
869 | 869
order
Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Mon 06/03 1:38 PM
Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying 848 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in light of Order at Dkt. No. 866. These filings will be unsealed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (COURT STAFF) |