Ashford Hospitality Prime Inc v. Sessa Capital (Master) LP et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Referred: | David L Horan |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00527 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 23, 2016 4:22 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Sessa Capital (Master) LP
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Ashford Hospitality Prime Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lawrence A Cunningham
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philip B Livingston
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John E Petry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sessa Capital (Master) LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sessa Capital GP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sessa Capital IM GP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sessa Capital IM LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel B Silvers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chris D Wheeler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashford Hospitality Prime Inc
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ashford Inc
14185 Dallas Pkwy. Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75254 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Monty J Bennett
14185 Dallas Pkwy. Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75254 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Stefani D Carter
5665 Arapaho
Dallas, TX 75248 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Douglas A Kessler
14185 Dallas Pkwy. Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75254 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Curtis B McWilliams
970 Via Lugano
Winter Park, FL 32789 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
W Michael Murphy
2727 Paces Ferry Road, Two Paces West, Suite 200
Atlanta, GA 30339 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Matthew D Rinaldi
1717 Main Street; Ste. 4200
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ashford Hospitality Advisors LLC
14185 Dallas Pkwy. Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75254 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Andrew Strong
2 Houston Center, 909 Fannin Ste. 2000
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Sessa Capital (Master) LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
162 | 162
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/24 11:46 AM
AGREED ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND: The Court hereby ORDERS that the Bond and accrued interest be released to Ashford Hospitality Prime and directs the Clerk of the Court to release the Bond to Ashford Hospitality Prime and mail the check to Andrews Kurth Kenyon LLP, 1717 Main Street, Suite 3700, Dallas, Texas 75201, Attn: Debbie Reese. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/24/2017) (sss) |
|
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
161 | 161
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/20 2:58 PM
Joint STIPULATION For Release of Injunction Bond by Ashford Hospitality Prime Inc, Stefani D Carter, Douglas A Kessler, Curtis B McWilliams, W Michael Murphy, Matthew D Rinaldi, Andrew Strong. (Nielsen, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
160 | 160
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/20 2:28 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (Voluntary) With Prejudice by Ashford Hospitality Prime Inc, Stefani D Carter, Douglas A Kessler, Curtis B McWilliams, W Michael Murphy, Matthew D Rinaldi, Andrew Strong. (Nielsen, Matthew) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/21 10:54 AM
Civil Case Terminated per160 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice. (twd) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
159 | 159
order
Order Consolidating Cases
Fri 02/17 4:22 PM
ORDER: The Court grants in part and denies in part Sessa's128 motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint, grants the44 motions to dismiss Counts IV of Sessa's first amended counterclaims and third-party claims, denies Sessa's114 motion for leave to file a surreply, grants the132 motion to consolidate related cases, grants Ashford Prime's96 motion to compel, and denies the150 motions for sanctions. Ashford I is hereby consolidated with Ashford II. All pleadings, motions, or other papers from this point forward will be filed in Civil Action No. 3:16-CV-00527-N. The clerk of court shall administratively close 3:16-CV-00713-N for statistical purposes. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/17/2017) (sss) |