Ashford Hospitality Prime, Inc, et al v. Sessa Capital (Master), L.P., et al
Original Case: 3:16-cv-00527
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-pcf-10671 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2016 2:28 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
CHRIS D. WHEELER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DANIEL B. SILVERS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
LAWRENCE A. CUNNINGHAM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
PHILIP B. LIVINGSTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JOHN E. PETRY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SESSA CAPITAL IM GP, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SESSA CAPITAL IM, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SESSA CAPITAL GP, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Third Party Plaintiff - Appellant
SESSA CAPITAL (MASTER), L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ASHFORD HOSPITALITY PRIME, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
W. MICHAEL MURPHY
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
MATTHEW D. RINALDI
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
ASHFORD, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
ASHFORD HOSPITALITY ADVISORS, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
MONTY J. BENNETT
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
CURTIS B. MCWILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
STEFANI D. CARTER
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
ANDREW STRONG
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant - Appellee
DOUGLAS A. KESSLER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/19/2016 2:28 AM CST |
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
APPEARANCE FORM of Sundeep Kumar (Rob) Addy for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. 16-10671 (Sundeep Kumar Addy ) | ||
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sundeep Kumar Addy for party(s) Appellant Lawrence A. Cunningham Appellant Chris D. Wheeler Appellant Philip B. Livingston Appellant Sessa Capital (Master), L.P. Appellant Sessa Capital IM GP, L.L.C. Appellant Sessa Capital IM, L.P. Appellant Daniel B. Silvers Appellant Sessa Capital GP, L.L.C. Appellant John E. Petry, in case 16-10671 16-10671 (MCS) | ||
PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Lawrence A. Cunningham, Mr. Philip B. Livingston, Mr. John E. Petry, Sessa Capital (Master), L.P., Sessa Capital GP, L.L.C., Sessa Capital IM GP, L.L.C., Sessa Capital IM, L.P., Mr. Daniel B. Silvers and Mr. Chris D. Wheeler 16-10671 (MVM) | ||
OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Lawrence A. Cunningham, Mr. Philip B. Livingston, Mr. John E. Petry, Sessa Capital (Master), L.P., Sessa Capital GP, L.L.C., Sessa Capital IM GP, L.L.C., Sessa Capital IM, L.P., Mr. Daniel B. Silvers and Mr. Chris D. Wheeler EMERGENCY MOTION for Modification of the District Court's Preliminary Injunction and Stay of Annual Stockholders Meeting Pending Appeal and to Expedite the Appeal for injunction pending appeal [8212286-2], for stay pending appeal [8212286-3] Ruling is requested by: 06/06/2016 at 05:00 pm, to expedite the appeal [8212286-4], for expedited ruling on [8212286-5]. Date of service: 05/25/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Addy, Byars, Doman, Skiermont, Summers; Attorney for Appellees: Clarke, Hoff, Nelson, Nielsen 16-10671 (Sundeep Kumar Addy ) |