National Abortion Federation, et al v. Center for Medical Progress, et al
Original Case: 3:15-cv-03522
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-15360 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 31, 2017 1:32 AM PDT |
Amicus Curiae
FETAL TISSUE RESEARCHERS, MEDICAL SPECIALISTS, ACADEMICS, AND MEDICAL LEGAL ETHICISTS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
JOURNALISM SCHOLARS AND JOURNALISTS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PLANNED PARENTHOOD AFFILIATES OF CALIFORNIA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
WILLIAM WOOD BASSETT, ASHUTOSH BHAGWAT, MARSHALL BREGER, ROBERT DESTRO, MARY ANN GLENDON, MICHAEL W. McCONNELL, CLARE NUECHTERLEIN, STEVEN H. SHIFFRIN, RICHARD STITH, GERALD F. UELMEN, and JAMES WEINSTEIN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CHARLOTTE LOZIER INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PEACE CROWELL LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ATTORNEYS GENERAL OF ALABAMA, ARIZONA, ARKANSAS, GEORGIA, LOUISIANA, MICHIGAN, MONTANA, NEBRASKA, NEVADA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, TEXAS, UTAH, and WISCONSIN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
JUSTICE AND FREEDOM FUND
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CATHOLIC LAWYERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae - Pending
CONSTITUTIONAL LAW PROFESSORS, NAOMI CAHN, JUNE CARBONE, MICHELE GOODWIN, MARTHA FIELD, LISA IKEMOTO, KEVIN JOHNSON, RONALD KROTOSZYNSKI, MELISSA MURRAY, BURT NEUBORNE, RADHIKA RAO, DOROTHY ROBERTS, PRISCILLA SMITH, and RUQAIIJAH A. YEARBY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
TROY NEWMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DAVID DALEIDEN, AKA Robert Daoud Sarkis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
BIOMAX PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION, NAF
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PLANNED PARENTHOOD PASADENA AND SAN GABRIEL VALLEY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PLANNED PARENTHOOD: SHASTA-DIABLO, INC., DBA Planned Parenthood Northern California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF SANTA BARBARA, VENTURA AND SAN LUIS OBISPO COUNTIES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PLANNED PARENTHOOD/ORANGE AND SAN BERNARDINO COUNTIES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PLANNED PARENTHOOD LOS ANGELES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF THE PACIFIC SOUTHWEST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PLANNED PARENTHOOD MAR MONTE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/31/2017 1:30 AM PDT |
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3 Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/14/2016. [9891164] (IV) [Entered: 03/07/2016 09:16 AM] | |
2 | 2 Filed (ECF) Appellee National Abortion Federation Correspondence: Letter requesting that pursuant to the Ninth Circuits General Orders the appeal for this case be assigned to the original panel for review.. Date of service: 03/07/2016 [9891604] 16-15360 (Foran, Derek) [Entered: 03/07/2016 11:38 AM] | |
3 | 3 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: HMB): The appeal filed on March 5, 2016 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than April 4, 2016; the answering brief is due May 2, 2016 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The parties are reminded that streamlined requests for extensions of time are not available in preliminary injunction appeals. See http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/content/view.php?pk_id=0000000638. Any request for an extension of time must be requested under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [9891614] --[Edited: Attached PDF of order. 03/07/2016 by TYL] (TSP) [Entered: 03/07/2016 11:41 AM] |