Kane County (2) v. USA
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Clark Waddoups |
Referred: | T Lane Wilson |
Case #: | 2:10-cv-01073 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action |
Case Filed: | Oct 28, 2010 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2016 11:39 PM MDT |
Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
State of Utah
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Derik Brinkerhoff
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Gay Brinkerhoff
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Grand Canyon Trust
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Chris Odekerken
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Sierra Club
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Wilderness Society
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kane County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
784 | 784
notice
Notice (Other)
Sun 04/21 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Response to Notice783 by USA re783 Notice (Other) (Kim, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit correspondence | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
783 | 783
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/16 6:50 PM
NOTICE of Road Maintenance by Kane County (Welch, Shawn) |