Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Case #: 3:16-cv-00702
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 09, 2016
Terminated:Jul 18, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Nov 05, 2016 6:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Theodore McKee
Plaintiff
Robert Pritsker
32 Steephill Road
Weston, CT 06883

GPO Jul 18 2016
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/18/2016. (Buttrick, A.)

Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
13 13 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 08/23 4:02 PM
MANDATE of USCA dated 8/22/2017 AFFIRMING the Judgment re11 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Pritsker (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2016
12 12 appeal Index to Record on Appeal Tue 08/16 10:34 AM
Index to Record on Appeal by Robert Pritsker re11 Notice of Appeal,1 Complaint,10 Order Dismissing Case,9 Response to Order to Show Cause,4 Electronic Service Documents,3 Protective Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,6 Consent to Electronic Notice,8 Order to Show Cause,5 Electronic Summons Issued,7 MOTION for by Pro Se Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing Order. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
11 11 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 08/16 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to10 Order Dismissing Case by Robert Pritsker. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number CTXB00007389. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2016
10 10 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/18 4:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/18/2016. (Buttrick, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
9 9 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 06/03 3:13 PM
RESPONSE TO8 Order to Show Cause by Robert Pritsker filed by Robert Pritsker. (Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
8 8 order Order to Show Cause Mon 05/16 3:17 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Judicial Immunity and Causation. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2016. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/16/2016. (Buttrick, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2016
7 7 motion Order Tue 05/10 1:41 PM
MOTION by Pro Se Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Robert Pritsker. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Consent to Electronic Notice Tue 05/10 1:40 PM
Consent to Electronic Notice by Robert Pritsker (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 05/10 11:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Theodore McKee* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Robert Pritsker* *32 Sheephill Road* *Weston, CT 06883* (Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 05/10 11:36 AM
NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF: Plaintiff initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint filed by Robert Pritsker,3 Standing Protective Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2016.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 05/10 12:09 PM
Filing fee received from Robert Pritsker: $400.00, receipt number 466836. (Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
3 3 order Protective Order Tue 05/10 11:33 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/9/2016.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 05/10 11:32 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/9/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2016. Discovery due by 11/8/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2016. Signed by Clerk on 5/9/2016.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/10 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Theodore McKee, filed by Robert Pritsker.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]