Original Case: 3:16-cv-00702

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-02860
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2016
Terminated:Jun 28, 2017
Last checked: Friday Jun 30, 2017 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Theodoe A. McKee
Defendant - Appellee
Theodore A. McKee
Represented By
Sandra Slack Glover
United States Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert L. Pritsker
Represented By
Robert L. Pritsker
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/30/2017 4:29 AM EDT
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert L. Pritsker, FILED. [1844472] 16-2860 [Entered: 08/18/2016 03:51 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/18/2016, RECEIVED.[1844482] 16-2860 [Entered: 08/18/2016 03:55 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Robert L. Pritsker, district court receipt # CTXB00007389, FILED.[1844489] 16-2860 [Entered: 08/18/2016 03:56 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1844492] 16-2860 [Entered: 08/18/2016 03:57 PM]
Related: [-]