Number Assigned
Original Case: 6:14-cv-01544
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-prici-12647 |
Type | private civil / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | May 17, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 24, 2016 6:11 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
J. C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
C. M. J., by and through D.L.J., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
D. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
A. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
S. P., individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
J. B. W., by and through K.P.B., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
K. B., individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
J. B., by and through K.B., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
S. G., by and through S.M.G., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
D. M. J., by and through D.L.J., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
T. P., by and through S.P., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
L. C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
A. L., by and through D.L., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
C. M., individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
J. K., by and through R.K., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
E. M., individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
S. M., by and through E.M., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
J. M., by and through E.M., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
D. H., by and through J.H., as Next Friend, Parent and Court-Appointed Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
M. B., individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
A. B., by and through M.B., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
S. L. K., individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
D. S., individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
J. S., by and through D.S., as Next Friend, Parent and Natural Guardian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
D. L., individually
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 17 2018
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant A. L. in 16-12647, Appellant S.J.K. in 17-10143, Appellants A.B. and M.B. in 17-10144, Appellants E.M., J.M. and S.M. in 17-10148, Appellant J.K. in 17-10149, Appellants J.C. and L.C. in 17-10150, Appellant T.P. in 17-10151, Appellants J.B.W. and K.P.B. in 17-10152, Appellants J.D.S. and R.E.S. in 17-10153, Appellant A.M.W. in 17-10154, Appellant A.C.W. in 17-10193, Appellants C.J.K. and P.A.K. in 17-10194, Appellants M.A.C. and R.M. in 17-10195, Appellant C.J.J. in 17-10196, Appellant P.H.G. in 17-10198, Appellants J.W.B., N.F.B. and V.J.B. in 17-10199, Appellant J.S.H. in 17-10200, Appellants J.T.I. and K.J.I. in 17-10202, Appellant T.A.L. in 17-10203, Appellants C.F. and D.F. in 17-10205, Appellants E.R.M., J.M.M. and M.A.M. in 17-10206, Appellants G.C.P., J.C.P. and M.I.P. in 17-10207, Appellants A.J.M. and O.M.M. in 17-10208, Appellants A.M.N. and V.M.N. in 17-10209, Appellants J.R.P. and L.J.P. in 17-10212, Appellants G.M.G., J.M.G. and R.J.R.G. in 17-10213, Appellants A.J.F. and T.E.F. in 17-10214, Appellants D.L.B. and LV.F. in 17-10216, Appellant S.A.B. in 17-10217, Appellants B.D.G. and J.T.G. in 17-10218. Decision: Affirmed in part and Reversed in part. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. [16-12647, 17-10143, 17-10144, 17-10148, 17-10149, 17-10150, 17-10151, 17-10152, 17-10153, 17-10154, 17-10193, 17-10194, 17-10195, 17-10196, 17-10198, 17-10199, 17-10200, 17-10202, 17-10203, 17-10205, 17-10206, 17-10207, 17-10208, 17-10209, 17-10212, 17-10213, 17-10214, 17-10216, 17-10217, 17-10218] (Opinion corrected on 9/7/2018.)--[Edited 09/07/2018 by JRP] |