A. L. et al v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts US, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Gregory J Kelly |
Case #: | 6:14-cv-01544 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2014 |
Re-opened: | Sep 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2020 |
Case in other court: | USCA, 16-12647-E California Central, 2:14-cv-03327 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walt Disney Parks and Resorts US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D.L.
Dogali Law Group, P.A. 101 E Kennedy Blvd Suite 1100
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A.L.
Dogali Law Group, P.A. 101 E Kennedy Blvd Suite 1100
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
J. K.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. B. W.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. S.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. S.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. P.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. P.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. M.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. M.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E. M.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. M.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. M.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. L. K.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. J. K.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. M. J.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. M. J.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. H.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. G.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. C.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. C.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M. B.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K. P. B.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K. B.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. B.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. B.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
misc
Exhibits destruction
Fri 03/10 3:58 PM
CLERK'S certificate of destruction of exhibits re330 Defendants' Exhibit List,329 Plaintiff's Exhibit List from the Bench Trial held February 18-20, 2020. Exhibits have been destroyed pursuant to the Local Rules following notice to the parties given on December 23, 2022. (KM) |