Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20001 - OSG International, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20002 - OSG Bulk Ships, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20003 - 1372 Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20004 - Africa Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20005 - Alcesmar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20006 - Alcmar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20007 - Alpha Suezmax Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20008 - Alpha Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20009 - Amalia Product Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20010 - Ambermar Product Carrier Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20011 - Ambermar Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20012 - Andromar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20013 - Antigmar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20014 - Aqua Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20015 - Aquarius Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20016 - Ariadmar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20017 - Aspro Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20018 - Atalmar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20019 - Athens Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20020 - Atlas Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20021 - Aurora Shipping Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20022 - Avila Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20023 - Batangas Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20024 - Beta Aframax Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20025 - Brooklyn Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20026 - Cabo Hellas Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20027 - Cabo Sounion Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20028 - Caribbean Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20029 - Carina Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20030 - Carl Product Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20031 - Concept Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20032 - Crown Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20033 - Delphina Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20034 - Delta Aframax Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20035 - DHT Ania Aframax Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20036 - DHT Ann VLCC Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20038 - DHT Chris VLCC Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20039 - DHT Rebecca Aframax Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20040 - DHT Regal Unity VLCC Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20041 - DHT Sophie Aframax Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20048 - First Union Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20049 - Fourth Aframax Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20050 - Front President Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20051 - Goldmar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20052 - GPC Aframax Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20054 - International Seaways, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20055 - Jademar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20057 - Juneau Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20058 - Kimolos Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20059 - Kythnos Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20060 - Leo Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20061 - Leyte Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20062 - Limar Charter Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-50053 - Grace Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-50056 - Joyce Car Carrier Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20037 - DHT Cathy Aframax Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20042 - Dignity Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20043 - Edindun Shipping Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20044 - Eighth Aframax Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20045 - Epsilon Aframax Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20046 - First Chemical Carrier Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20047 - First LPG Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20053 - Grace Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20056 - Joyce Car Carrier Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20063 - Luxmar Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20064 - Luxmar Tanker LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20065 - Majestic Tankers Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20066 - Maple Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20067 - Maremar Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20068 - Maremar Tanker LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20069 - Marilyn Vessel Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20070 - Maritrans General Partner Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20071 - Maritrans Operating Company L.P.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20072 - Milos Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20073 - Mindanao Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20074 - Mykonos Tanker LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20075 - Nedimar Charter Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20076 - Oak Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20077 - Ocean Bulk Ships, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20078 - Oceania Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20079 - OSG 192 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20080 - OSG 209 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20081 - OSG 214 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20082 - OSG 215 Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20083 - OSG 242 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20084 - OSG 243 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20085 - OSG 244 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20086 - OSG 252 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20087 - OSG 254 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20088 - OSG 300 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20089 - OSG 400 LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20090 - OSG America L.P.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20091 - OSG America LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20092 - OSG America Operating Company LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20093 - OSG Car Carriers, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20094 - OSG Clean Products International, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20095 - OSG Columbia LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20096 - OSG Constitution LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20097 - OSG Courageous LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20098 - OSG Delaware Bay Lightering LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20099 - OSG Discovery LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20100 - OSG Endeavor LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20101 - OSG Endurance LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20102 - OSG Enterprise LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20103 - OSG Financial Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20104 - OSG Freedom LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20105 - OSG Honour LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20106 - OSG Independence LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20107 - OSG Intrepid LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20108 - OSG Liberty LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20109 - OSG Lightering LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20110 - OSG Lightering Acquisition Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20111 - OSG Lightering Solutions LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20112 - OSG Mariner LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20113 - OSG Maritrans Parent LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20114 - OSG Navigator LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20115 - OSG New York, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20116 - OSG Product Tankers AVTC, LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20117 - OSG Product Tankers Member LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20118 - OSG Product Tankers II, LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20119 - OSG Product Tankers I, LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20120 - OSG Product Tankers, LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20121 - OSG Quest LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20122 - OSG Seafarer LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20123 - OSG Ship Management, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20124 - OSG Valour LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20125 - Overseas Allegiance Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20126 - Overseas Anacortes LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20127 - Overseas Boston LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20128 - Overseas Diligence LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20129 - Overseas Galena Bay LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20130 - Overseas Houston LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20131 - Overseas Integrity LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20132 - Overseas Long Beach LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20133 - Overseas Los Angeles LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20134 - Overseas Martinez LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20135 - Overseas New Orleans LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20136 - Overseas New York LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20137 - Overseas Nikiski LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20138 - Overseas Perseverance Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20139 - Overseas Philadelphia LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20140 - Overseas Puget Sound LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20141 - Overseas Sea Swift Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20142 - Overseas Shipping (GR) Ltd.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20143 - Overseas ST Holding LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20144 - Overseas Tampa LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20145 - Overseas Texas City LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20146 - Pearlmar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20147 - Petromar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20148 - Pisces Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20149 - Polaris Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20150 - Queens Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20151 - Reymar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20152 - Rich Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20153 - Rimar Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20154 - Rosalyn Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20155 - Rosemar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20156 - Rubymar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20157 - Sakura Transport Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20158 - Samar Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20159 - Santorini Tanker LLC
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20160 - Serifos Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20161 - Seventh Aframax Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20162 - Shirley Tanker SRL
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20163 - Sifnos Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20164 - Silvermar Limited
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20165 - Sixth Aframax Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20166 - Skopelos Product Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20167 - Star Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20168 - Suezmax International Agencies, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20169 - Talara Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20170 - Third United Shipping Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20171 - Tokyo Transport Corp.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20172 - Transbulk Carriers, Inc.
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20173 - Troy Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20174 - Troy Product Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20175 - Urban Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20176 - Vega Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20177 - View Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20178 - Vivian Tankships Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20179 - Vulpecula Chartering Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Joint Admin
|
1:12-bk-20180 - Wind Aframax Tanker Corporation
|
11/14/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-50294 - Overseas Shipholding Group, Inc. et al. v. Robert Porzio et al
|
01/14/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-50854 - OSG America Operating Company LLC v. BP Oil Shipping Company USA, Inc.
|
02/25/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-50983 - Overseas Shipholding Group, Inc. et al v. Abdul R. Abdo, Bert L. Abella, Earl Adams, Kasem S
|
04/25/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-52492 - Overseas Shipholding Group, Inc. v. Alan P. Parnes et al
|
11/18/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:14-ap-50401 - Crown Tanker Corporation v. SY Tankers Limited
|
06/06/2014
|