Member Case
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-20000

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter J Walsh
Case #: 1:12-bk-50053
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2012
Terminated:Sep 02, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Grace Chartering Corporation
666 3rd Ave
New York, NY 10017-4011
Represented By
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
James L. Bromley
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 02, 2014
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 29, 2014
5 5 Final Decree and Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105 and 350, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Local Rule 3022-1 Closing Certain Subsidiary Cases and Modifying Case Caption. Signed on 8/28/2014. (NAB) Modified on 9/5/2014 (Marvel, Ivone).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2013
4 4 Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Grace Chartering Corporation. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 Schedules/Statements filed: Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Grace Chartering Corporation. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2012
2 2 Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An Order Has Been Entered In Accordance With Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) And Local Rule 1015-1 Directing The Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases of 12-20000 Through 12-200180. All Further Pleadings And Other Papers Shall Be Filed In, And All Further Docket Entries Shall Be Made In, Case No. 12-20000 Signed on 11/15/2012(JohnstonJ, Julie)
Related: [-]
Judge Peter J. Walsh added to case. (LA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 14, 2012
1 1 22 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number 0, Fee Amount $1046. Filed by Grace Chartering Corporation . (Abbott, Derek)
Related: [-]