Old BPSUSH Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-12373 |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
BPS US Holdings Inc.
100 Domain Dr
Exeter, NH 03833-4801 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Old BPSUSH Inc.
100 Domain Drive
Exeter, NH 03833 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:50 PM EST |
Attorney
Blank Rome LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Brown Rudnick LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Cassels Brock & Blackwell LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
|
|
Attorney
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
|
|
Auditor
KPMG LLP
|
Represented By
|
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Michael St. Patrick Baxter
|
Represented By
|
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Michael St. Patrick Baxter, Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Albany Road - 100 Domain LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Express Travel Related Services Company,
PO Box 3001
Malvern, PA 19355 |
|
Creditor
Argo Partners
12 West 37th Street, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Melina Woon Avery
230 West Spring Avenue
Ardmore, PA 19003 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Banc of America Leasing & Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Burlington Crossroads (E&A), LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Creative Community Connections, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DACA VI LLC
1565 Hotel Circle S, #310
San Diego, CA 92108 |
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
G-Form, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Geodis Logistics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jeremy Kovar
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Liquidity Solutions, Inc.
1 University Plaza, Suite 312
Hackensack, NJ 07601 |
|
Creditor
Mission Product Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomas Troy Mohns
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nike, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oakley, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Old PSG Wind Down Liquidation Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Shawn M. Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Plumbers & Pipefitters National Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Primeshares
261 Fifth Avenue 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
|
Creditor
Q30 Sports, LLC and Q30 Sports Science, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RB Minneapolis Management dba Radisson Blu Minneapolis
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Recreational Equipment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Amir Rosenthal
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Brown & Connery, LLP Donald K. Ludman, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sierra Pacific Constructors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sigma Global Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Matthew Smith
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sonar Credit Partners III, LLC
80 Business Park Drive Suite 208
Armonk, NY 10504 |
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund LP
555 Theodore Fremd Avenue Suite C209
Rye, NY 10580 |
|
Creditor
UR Best Resort, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
USA Hockey, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Parcel Service, Inc.
Bialson, Bergen & Schwab c/o Lawrence Schwab/Kenneth Law 633 Menlo Ave. Suit 100
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Holders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Equity Security Holders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of BPS US Holdings Inc., et al.
|
Represented By
|
Fee Examiner
M. J. Renick & Associates LLC
|
|
Financial Advisor
Houlihan Lokey Inc.
|
|
Financial Advisor
Province, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
2484842 Ontario Limited
|
|
Interested Party
251091708 Delaware LP
|
|
Interested Party
9938982 Canada Inc. and Sagard Capital
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
BCP GP Limited
|
|
Interested Party
Bank of America, N.A., as administrative agent and collateral agent (the "ABL Agent")
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
George F. Bartlett
|
|
Interested Party
Blackwell Partners, LLC, Series A
|
|
Interested Party
Brookfield Asset Management Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Brookfield Capital Partners Ltd.
|
|
Interested Party
Brookfield Private Equity Group Holdings LP
|
|
Interested Party
Brookfield Private Equity Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Brookfiled Asset Management Private Institutional Capital Adviser (Private Equity), L.P.
|
|
Interested Party
Certain Prepetition Term Loan Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Yohan Charette
|
|
Interested Party
Coliseum Capital Partners II, L.P.
|
|
Interested Party
Coliseum Capital Partners, L.P.
|
|
Interested Party
College of the Holy Cross
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Rocco Covella
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Paul English
|
|
Interested Party
Ernst & Young Inc., as Monitor of the Debtors in the Canadian Proceedings
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Samuel E. Gasowski
|
|
Interested Party
Hungry Asset Monster, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Harlan M. Kent
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Robert F. Kirby
|
|
Interested Party
Mark E. Palmer, Chief Wind-Down Officer of the Reorganized Debtors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Licensing, GP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
New Generation Advisors, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Partners Limited
|
|
Interested Party
Anna Pastore
|
|
Interested Party
PubCo Investments LP
|
|
Interested Party
Ravensource Fund
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sandy Sepulveda-Ayers
|
|
Interested Party
Darren Stefaryshyn
|
|
Interested Party
Stornoway Recovery Fund LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Hockey Equipment Certification Council, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jennifer Tobbe
339 Bow Lake Road
Northwood, NH 03261 |
|
Interested Party
Vogel Strategic Investments, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
VonWin Capital Management, L.P.
261 Fifth Avenue 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
|
Interested Party
Shusen Wang
|
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Liquidating Trustee
Mark E. Palmer as the Liquidation Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Liquidating Trustee
Theseus Strategy Group LLC as the Liquidation Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Centerview Partners LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Cole Schotz P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Behind the bankruptcy of Performance Sports Group (nhbr.com) |
Submitted Fri 11/11/2016 | |
2. | Performance Sports Group files for bankruptcy, plans to sell all of its assets (nypost.com) |
Submitted Mon 10/31/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |