Old PSG Wind-down Ltd.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-12373
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-12373
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-12386 |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Bauer Hockey Corp.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Final Decree
Thu 04/20 2:03 PM
Order Granting Motion of Old PSG Ltd. and the Old PSG Trust for Entry of: (I) Order (A) Approving Final Report and Account and Final Distribution: (B) Authorizing the Dissolution of Old PSG Ltd., Old PSG Trust, and the Remaining Debtors; (C) Authorizing Abandonment of Books, Records, and Information; (D) Discharging and Releasing Chief Wind-Down Officer, Old PSG Trustee, Board of Directors, Trust Advisory Board, and Monitor; and (E) Granting Related Relief; and (II) Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 4/20/2023 (LCN) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 04/20 2:16 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 06/25 2:27 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated. Order Signed 6/25/2019 (BA) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 12/16 1:03 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Bauer Hockey Corp.. (Rucki, Justin) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 12/16 1:02 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Bauer Hockey Corp.. (Rucki, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 11/02 9:09 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-12386 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8219539, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 11/01 10:53 AM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of BPS US Holdings Inc.; Bauer Hockey, Inc.; Easton Baseball / Softball Inc.; Bauer Hockey Retail Inc.; Bauer Performance Sports Uniforms Inc.; Performance Lacrosse Group Inc.; BPS Diamond Sports Inc.; PSG Innovation Inc.; Performance Sports Group Ltd. (CA); KBAU Holdings Canada, Inc. (CA); Bauer Hockey Retail Corp. (CA); Easton Baseball / Softball Corp. (CA); PSG Innovation Corp. (CA) Bauer Hockey Corp. (CA); BPS Canada Intermediate Corp. (CA); BPS Diamond Sports Corp. (CA); Bauer Performance Sports Uniforms Corp. (CA); and Performance Lacrosse Group Corp. (CA). The Debtors headquarters are located at 100 Domain Dr., Exeter, New Hampshire 03833. The docket in the chapter 11 case of BPS US Holdings Inc., Case No. 16-12373 (KJC), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 11/1/2016 (LMD) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 10/31 6:14 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Bauer Hockey Corp.. (Greecher, Sean) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 10/31 7:45 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |