Marc A. Pergamnet, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate v. Elegant Affairs Caterers et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:17-ap-08003 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Elegant Affairs Caterers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allison Carryl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc A Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl
400 Garden City Plaza Suite 403
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 12/28 11:03 AM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-8003 Closed (dhc) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Authorize/Direct
Tue 10/10 9:50 AM
Ordered, The Motion is Granted to the extent provided herein; pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 the Settlement, and all of its terms and conditions, are approved; the Trustee is authorized to take any and all actions reasonably necessary to consummate the Settlement and perform any and all obligations contemplated therein and the Court shall retain jurisdiction with respect to all matters arising from or related to the implementation of this Order. , Granting Motion to Compromise Controversy Signed on 10/6/2017. (ymm) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held - Text Orders (Document BK & AP)
Tue 09/19 3:51 PM
Hearing Held; - MOTION MARKED OFF AS SETTLED, MOTION TO COMPROMISE PRESENTED FOR 9/22/17 (ymills) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Authorize/Direct
Thu 08/24 3:05 PM
Motion to Authorize/Direct . Objections to be filed on September 15, 2017 at 10:00 a.m.. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: TO BE DETERMINED., Motion to Compromise Controversy . Objections to be filed on September 15, 2017 at 10:00 a.m.. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: TO BE DETERMINED. Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A Pergament. Order to be presented for signature on 9/22/2017. (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation in Support | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Wed 07/26 3:56 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/12/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (ymills) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings)
Mon 07/24 2:12 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from July 25, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. to September 12, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A Pergament (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) Modified on 7/25/2017 (ymm) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Thu 07/20 4:07 PM
Letter Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A Pergament (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Generic Order
Thu 07/06 3:01 PM
Order Regarding Settlement Conference. The Plaintiff and Defendants shall attend a settlement conference at the Plaintiff's offices on a date to be agreed, but not later than 7/20/2017. By no later than 7/24/2017 at 4:00 pm the Plaintiff shall file a letter with the Court regarding the result of the settlement conference. An adjourned status conference is scheduled for 7/25/2017 at 2:00 p.m. . Signed on 7/6/2017 (dhc) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
Abstract of Judgment
Thu 06/29 10:50 AM
Amended Abstract of Judgment: Judgment entered on 4/20/2017, against Elegant Affairs Caterers represented by Prose in favor of Marc A Pergament Chapter 7 Trustee of The Bankruptcy Estate of Rudolph C Carryl represented by Nicholas Tuffarelli Esq in the amount of $ 11,792.00 (amh) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP)
Wed 06/21 10:16 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance(s) by Nicholas Tuffarelli and Allison Carrly - Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/25/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (ymills) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Statement
Fri 06/16 3:54 PM
Defendant's Automatic Disclosures Filed by Allison Carryl (srm) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Joint Discovery Control Plan
Fri 05/19 12:08 PM
Joint Discovery Control Plan Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A Pergament (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
19 | 19
court
Abstract of Judgment
Fri 05/19 10:00 AM
Abstract of Judgment: Judgment entered on 4/20/2017, against Elegant Affairs Caterers represented by Prose in favor of Marc A Pergament Chapter 7 Trustee of The Bankruptcy Estate of Rudolph C Carryl represented by Nicholas Tuffarelli Esq in the amount of $ 11,792.00 pursuant to Section 273 of the NY Debtor and Creditor Law (amh) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a
Thu 05/18 12:58 PM
Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A Pergament (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Wed 05/10 11:37 AM
Receipt Number 250526; Fee Amount $ 30.00 for Abstract of Judgment - also docketed under main case 15-70282 (dms) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Sat 04/29 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/28/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Initial Adversary Scheduling Order (Judge Trust Cases Only)
Wed 04/26 10:33 AM
Initial Scheduling Order; Parties are ordered to attend a conference under FRBP 7026f on or before May 22, 2017. Joint Discovery Control Plan due by 6/6/2017. Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a due by 6/6/2017. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/20/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. Signed on 4/25/2017 (ymm) |
|
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Mon 04/24 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment (Signed by Judge) (1/1/11)
Fri 04/21 9:51 AM
Judgment; Ordered, that Plaintiff has judgment against Defendant Elegant Affairs Caterers inthis Adversary Proceeding for the sum of $11,792.00, pursuant to Section 273 of the New York Debtor and Creditor Law. The Plaintiff shall have execution thereon. . Signed on 4/20/2017 (ymm) |
|
13 | 13
order
Default Judgment
Fri 04/21 9:45 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment against Elegant Affairs Caterers. Signed on 4/20/2017. (ymm) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extending Time to File Answer
Thu 03/23 8:03 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order by and between Attorneys for Plaintiff and Defendant, Allison Carryl Extending Time for Defendant, Allison Carryl to File Answer. Answer Due 3/17/2017 . Signed on 3/21/2017 (ymm) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/17 2:46 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Allison Carryl (ssw) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Wed 03/15 2:30 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Marc Pergament on behalf of Marc A Pergament (Pergament, Marc) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 03/15 2:07 PM
Motion for Default Judgment . Objections to be filed on April 3, 2017. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: To be determined. Filed by Marc Pergament on behalf of Marc A Pergament. Order to be presented for signature on 4/11/2017. (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation in Support | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Judgment | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Proposed Stipulation
Fri 03/10 11:16 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Nicholas Tuffarelli, Esq. and Allison Carryl to Extend time to answer Filed by Marc Pergament on behalf of Allison Carryl (Pergament, Marc) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Proposed Stipulation to Extend Time to Object to Discharge ONLY
Fri 03/10 10:28 AM
Attorney entered in error. Notice of Proposed Stipulation to Extend Time to Object to the Debtor's Discharge/Dischargeability until March 17, 2017 Filed by Marc Pergament on behalf of Allison Carryl (Pergament, Marc) Modified on 3/10/2017 (sld) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Extending Time to File Answer
Wed 03/01 2:35 PM
Stipulation and Order by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Allison Carryl Extending Time for Defendant Allison Carryl to File Answer. Answer Due 3/10/2017 . Signed on 3/1/2017 (srm) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Proposed Stipulation
Tue 02/14 2:39 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Nicholas Tuffarelli, Esq. and Allison Carryl to Extend the time for defendant to respond to the complaint Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A Pergament (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 01/24 4:56 PM
Summons Served on Office of the United States Trustee 1/20/2017 . (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 01/24 4:52 PM
Summons Served on Allison Carryl 1/20/2017; Elegant Affairs Caterers 1/20/2017 . (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto)
Fri 01/20 3:06 PM
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Allison Carryl Answer Due: 2/21/2017; Elegant Affairs Caterers Answer Due: 2/21/2017 (dhc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 10:20 AM
Adversary case 8 17-08003 Complaint by Marc A. Pergamnet, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl against Elegant Affairs Caterers, Allison Carryl. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |