Rudolph C. Carryl
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:15-bk-70282 |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | May 12, 2015 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Nov 30, 2015 |
Debtor
Rudolph C. Carryl
43 Chestnut Hill Dr
Oyster Bay, NY 11771-2508 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Maureen R. Carryl, Ackerman Fox, LLP
90 Merrick Avenue Ste 400 90 Merrick Avenue, Ste 400
East Meadow, NY 11554 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allison Carryl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elegant Affairs Caterers c/o Andrea Correale
23 Broadfield Place
Glen Cove, NY 11540 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elegant Affairs Caterers
Elegant Affairs Caterers 110 Glen Cove Avenue
Glen Cove, NY 11542 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Kenneth Kirschenbaum
Kirschenbaum & Kirschenbaum 200 Garden City Plaza Suite 500
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Marc A Pergament
Weinberg Gross & Pergament 400 Garden City Plaza Suite 403
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 03/20/2017 9:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 23, 2015 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8 15-70282 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 13105993. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset & Appointment of Chapter 7 Trustee, Kenneth Kirschenbaum, , 341(a) Meeting to be held on 02/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Room 561, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY . Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 04/27/2015 . Financial Management Certificate due by 04/27/2015 . | ||
1 | 1 46 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Scott R Schneider on behalf of Rudolph C. Carryl (Schneider, Scott) | |
2 | 2 2 pgs Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to LR 2017-1 Filed by Scott R Schneider on behalf of Rudolph C. Carryl (Schneider, Scott) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Scott R Schneider on behalf of Rudolph C. Carryl (Schneider, Scott) | |
4 | 4 3 pgs Deficient Filing Chapter 7 : Section 521 Incomplete Filings due by 3/9/2015. Copies of pay statements received from any employer due by 2/6/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 2/6/2015. (dhc) |