Marc A. Pergamnet, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate v. AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:17-ap-08004 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc A. Pergamnet, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl
Weinberg Gross & Pergament LLP 400 Garden City Plaza Suite 403
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/11 2:49 PM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-8004 Closed (dnb) |
||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Authorize/Direct
Tue 06/26 6:42 PM
Order Granting Motion to Compromise Controversy Signed on 6/26/2018. (ymm) |
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Tue 06/26 10:43 AM
Hearing Held; Complaint by Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl against AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). - TRIAL MARKED OFF - MOTION TO COMPROMISE PRESENTED FOR SIGNATURE FOR 6/15/18. (ymills) |
||
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Authorize/Direct
Tue 05/22 12:29 PM
Motion to Compromise Controversy approving the settlement between the Trustee and AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. (Defendant) of the claims asserted in this adversary proceeding for the sum of $10,000.00 . Objections to be filed on June 13, 2018. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: To Be Determined., Motion to Authorize/Direct the Trustee to execute all documents necessary to effectuate the settlement of this adversary proceeding . Objections to be filed on June 13, 2018. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: To Be Determined. Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl. Order to be presented for signature on 6/15/2018. (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation in Support | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit s of Service | ||
Sunday, April 08, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Mon 04/09 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/08/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Pre-Trial Order
Fri 04/06 3:41 PM
Adversary Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. Parties are ordered to attend a conference under FRBP 7026f on or before April 30, 2018 . Signed on 4/6/2018. Discovery due by 5/29/2018. Trial date set for 6/26/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 760 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 6/12/2018. Objection to any portion of a witness affidavit, including evidentiary objections,due by June 18, 2018 (dnb) |
|
27 | 27
order
Generic Order
Fri 04/06 3:28 PM
ORDERED, that the Trustee's Motion is granted on the issue of lack of fair consideration under New York Debtor and Creditor Law § 273-a and McDonnaugh's Motion is denied; and it is further ORDERED, that the Court shall issue a trial scheduling order . Signed on 4/6/2018 (dnb) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Document)
Tue 03/20 9:14 AM
Ruling Conference scheduled for 3/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 760 (Judge Trust), CI, NY (ymm) |
||
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Document)
Tue 03/20 9:15 AM
Ruling Conference scheduled for 3/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 760 (Judge Trust), CI, NY (ymm) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Wed 03/28 1:19 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance(s) by Richard F Artura and Nicholas Tuffarelli - MOTION GRANTED & DENIED AS PER TERMS STATED ON THE RECORD - SUBMIT ORDER; IF THE PROPOSED ORDER IS NOT SUBMITTED OR SETTLED AS DIRECTED WITHIN 14 DAYS, THE MATTER MAY BE DEEMED ABANDONED PURSUANT TO E.D.N.Y. L.B.R. 9072-1. (ymm) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Wed 03/28 1:20 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance(s) by Richard F Artura and Nicholas Tuffarelli - MOTION GRANTED & DENIED AS PER TERMS STATED ON THE RECORD- SUBMIT ORDER; IF THE PROPOSED ORDER IS NOT SUBMITTED OR SETTLED AS DIRECTED WITHIN 14 DAYS, THE MATTER MAY BE DEEMED ABANDONED PURSUANT TO E.D.N.Y. L.B.R. 9072-1. (ymills) Modified on 3/28/2018 (ymm) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Wed 03/28 1:29 PM
Hearing Held; - Appearance(s) by Nicholas Tuffarelli and Richard Artura - SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART (ymills) |
||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Thu 03/01 4:21 PM
Letter to the Honorable Alan S. Trust Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter Providing Notice of Court Hearing (Only to be Used When Directed by Chambers)
Fri 02/23 12:15 PM
Letter Providing Notice of Court Hearing Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings)
Tue 01/23 4:08 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from January 23, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. to March 20, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Tue 01/23 3:12 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 760 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (ymills) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP)
Wed 11/29 10:43 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance(s) by Nicholas Tuffarelli and Richard Artura - Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/23/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 760 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (ymills) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Thu 09/21 6:20 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Richard F Artura on behalf of AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial (Artura, Richard) |
|
22 | 22
answer
Affirmation in Opposition
Thu 09/21 6:05 PM
Affirmation in Opposition Filed by Richard F Artura on behalf of AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial (Artura, Richard) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Affirmation in Opposition
Thu 09/21 9:54 AM
Affirmation in Opposition Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Thu 09/07 7:34 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Richard F Artura on behalf of AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial (Artura, Richard) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 09/07 7:29 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Richard F Artura on behalf of AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial. (Artura, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law | ||
18 | 18
answer
Memorandum of Law in Support
Thu 09/07 3:11 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff-Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
Transcript (Attorney Ordered) (AP)
Wed 08/30 12:22 PM
Transcript & Notice regarding the hearing held on 06/20/17. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the Office of the Clerk or may be purchased from the court transcriber. [Please see the court's website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency]. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Due By 09/6/2017. Redaction Request Due By 09/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/2/2017. TRANSCRIPT ACCESS WILL BE ELECTRONICALLY RESTRICTED THROUGH 11/28/2017 AND MAY BE VIEWED AT THE OFFICE OF THE CLERK. (Compuscribe, Inc) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 08/29 9:23 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order by and between Attorneys for Plaintiff and Attorneys for Defendant; that the time within which the parties may file a joint statement of facts and an exhibit book is hereby extended to and including August 28, 2017. The court had set August 21, 2017 as a deadline. (Dkt 12) . Signed on 8/28/2017 (ymm) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Statement
Fri 08/25 3:40 PM
Statement Rule 7056-1 Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Mon 08/21 3:12 PM
Letter requesting one week adjournment on consent of deadline for Joint Pretrial Submissions Filed by Richard F Artura on behalf of AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial (Artura, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Thu 07/20 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 07/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Sunday, July 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Pre-Trial Order
Mon 07/17 1:55 PM
Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/31/2018. Joint Pretrial Submissions on or before August 21, 2017. Dispositive Motions on or before September 7, 2017. Any Responses to Dispositive Motions on or before September 21, 2017. An adjourned pretrial conference is scheduled for November 14, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. . Signed on 7/16/2017 (ymm) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Wed 06/21 1:10 PM
Letter Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP)
Wed 06/21 10:20 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance(s) by Nicholas Tuffarelli and Richard Artura - Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/14/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. COURT TO ISSUE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (ymills) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a
Tue 06/06 5:02 PM
Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a Filed by Richard F Artura on behalf of AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial (Artura, Richard) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Joint Discovery Control Plan
Thu 05/11 12:01 PM
Joint Discovery Control Plan Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement
Tue 04/18 9:50 AM
Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a Filed by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Marc A. Pergament, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) Modified on 4/18/2017 to clarify (dnb) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Sunday, April 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Mon 04/17 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/16/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Adversary Scheduling Order (Judge Trust Cases Only)
Fri 04/14 8:03 AM
Initial Scheduling Order; Parties are ordered to attend a conference under FRBP 7026f on or before May 22, 2017. Joint Discovery Control Plan due by 6/6/2017. Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a due by 6/6/2017. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 6/20/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. Signed on 4/13/2017 (ymm) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/22 4:54 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Richard F Artura on behalf of AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial (Artura, Richard) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 01/23 2:22 PM
Summons Served on Office of the United States Trustee 1/23/2017 . (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 01/23 2:17 PM
Summons Served on AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial 1/23/2017 . (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto)
Mon 01/23 10:36 AM
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial. Answer Due: 2/22/2017 (dnb) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 10:31 AM
Adversary case 8 17-08004 Complaint by Marc A. Pergamnet, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Rudolph C. Carryl against AI McDonnaugh & Co. Inc. a/k/a AIM Financial. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). (Tuffarelli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |