Toisa Limited, et al.,
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10184 |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2022 |
Plan Confirmed: | Mar 15, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Toisa Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Toisa Limited, et al.,
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2017 1:14 PM EDT |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Creditor
DVB Bank America N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Unofficial Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Danish Ship Finance A/S
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commerzbank AG
1301 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Banco Nacional de Desenvolvimento Economico e Social-BNDES
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Citibank, N.A., London Branch, in its capacity as security agent
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Citibank Europe Plc in its capacity as security trustee
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Informal Committee of Secured Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
One Penn Plaza, Suite 3335
New York, NY 10119 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
|
Unknown
Citizens Asset Finance, Inc.
1633 Broadway, 47th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Blank Rome LLP
|
|
Unknown
Dong-A Tanker Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
HBN Law
|
|
Unknown
Lax & Co LLP
|
1. | Toisa Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy with debts and assets topping over $1 billion (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 01/30/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 59 seconds ago |