United Banner, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10184
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10184
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10204 |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
United Banner, Inc.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order, Final Decree
Fri 03/29 3:49 PM
Final Decree and Order Authorizing Closing of Chapter 11 Cases for Each of the Affiliated Debtors signed on 3/29/2019 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 03/29 4:48 PM
Case Closed. (Suarez, Aurea) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 03/31 7:27 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Statement of Financial Affairs for United Banner, Inc. Filed by Scott Eric Ratner on behalf of United Banner, Inc.. (Ratner, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules
Fri 03/31 7:07 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for United Banner, Inc. Filed by Scott Eric Ratner on behalf of United Banner, Inc.. (Ratner, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Tue 01/31 9:09 AM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration signed on 1/30/2017 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Tue 01/31 11:27 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Tue 01/31 1:42 PM
Case Jointly Administered. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Toisa Limited 17-10184 SCC))for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 17-10184 (SCC) should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed case. (Suarez, Aurea) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Mon 01/30 8:11 AM
Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 01/30 4:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10204 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 199081. Fee amount 1717.00. (Porter) |
||
Sunday, January 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Sun 01/29 10:29 PM
Motion for Joint Administration /Debtors' Motion for Order (I) Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Waiving Requirements of 11 U.S.C. § 342(c)(1) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1005 and 2002(n) filed by Albert Togut on behalf of United Banner, Inc.. (Togut, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 01/29 8:14 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 5/30/2017, Disclosure Statement due by 5/30/2017, Initial Case Conference due by 2/28/2017, Filed by Albert Togut of Togut, Segal & Segal LLP on behalf of United Banner, Inc.. (Togut, Albert) |