PC Drivers Headquarters, L.P. v. Ambicom Holdings, Incorporated
Original Case: 1:15-cv-01038
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-pcd-50330 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2018 2:30 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
AMBICOM HOLDINGS, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PC DRIVERS HEADQUARTERS, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/06/2018 2:30 AM CST |
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ambicom Holdings, Incorporated 17-50330 (RAJ) |