PC Drivers Headquarters, LP v. Ambicom Holdings, Inc.
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01038 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday May 15, 2016 3:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ambicom Holdings, Inc.
500 Alder Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PC Drivers Headquarters, LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Tue 02/06 8:49 AM
Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Dismissing Notice of Appeal, filed by Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (td) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically
Tue 05/09 8:16 AM
Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions[LINK:here] (td) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 04/18 11:08 PM
Appeal of Order entered by District Judge40 ,36 by Ambicom Holdings, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-9505197) (Hunt, Richard) |
|
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 04/19 8:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL following41 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by Ambicom Holdings, Inc. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0542-9505197. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out[LINK:Form DKT-13] (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (td) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Tue 04/04 4:20 PM
ORDER DENYING37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
39 | 39
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 04/04 5:50 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ambicom Holdings, Inc., re37 MOTION for Reconsideration re36 Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion to Set Aside, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 03/31 3:43 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP, re37 MOTION for Reconsideration re36 Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion to Set Aside, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc.(Brooks, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Reconsideration
Fri 03/24 1:26 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re36 Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion to Set Aside, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Ambicom Holdings, Inc..(Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Reconsideration | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion to Set Aside Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/20 3:58 PM
ORDER DISMISSING29 Motion to Expedite; DENYING16 Motion to Set Aside; DISMISSING22 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 03/15 5:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ambicom Holdings, Inc., re29 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Set Aside filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc. Supplement (Hunt, Richard) |
|
34 | 34
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 03/15 2:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ambicom Holdings, Inc., re29 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Set Aside filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice
Wed 03/15 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal and Request to Remove Gary E. Zausmer from Electronic Filing Notifications by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP (Brooks, Marcus) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/14 5:07 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP, re29 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Set Aside filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc.(Brooks, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Expedite | ||
31 | 31
notice
Deficiency Notice
Tue 03/14 4:46 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: proposed order is required re 30 Response in Opposition to Motion. (jf) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/14 4:19 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP, re29 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Set Aside filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc.(Brooks, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Expedite
Mon 03/13 4:47 PM
Opposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Set Aside by Ambicom Holdings, Inc..(Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/13 4:04 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP, re16 MOTION to Set Aside15 Default Judgment filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (Supplement to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Opposing Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Final Default Judgment)(Schumacher, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice
Tue 03/07 10:41 AM
NOTICE Of Related Cases by Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Response
Fri 02/03 11:32 AM
SUR-REPLY to16 MOTION to Set Aside15 Default Judgment by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP. (td) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 02/03 9:40 AM
Text Order GRANTING23 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 02/03 9:41 AM
Text Order TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT22 Motion for Oral Argument entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court does not intend to set a hearing at this time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/02 9:45 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ambicom Holdings, Inc., re23 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Ambicom Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Set Aside Final Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff PC Drivers Headquarters, LP(Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Leave to File | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/02 3:58 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP, re22 MOTION for Oral Argument re16 MOTION to Set Aside15 Default Judgment filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc.(Brooks, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 02/02 3:46 PM
Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Ambicom Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Set Aside Final Default Judgment by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP.(Brooks, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, January 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Sun 01/29 9:57 PM
MOTION for Oral Argument re16 MOTION to Set Aside15 Default Judgment by Ambicom Holdings, Inc..(Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Oral Argument | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Sun 01/29 9:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ambicom Holdings, Inc., re16 MOTION to Set Aside15 Default Judgment filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/26 4:17 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP, re16 MOTION to Set Aside15 Default Judgment filed by Defendant Ambicom Holdings, Inc.(Brooks, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Attachment
Fri 01/20 9:05 AM
ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to18 Deficiency Notice by Ambicom Holdings, Inc.. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Deficiency Notice
Fri 01/20 8:08 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Richard Martin Hunt: re 16 MOTION to Set Aside 15 Default Judgment . (td) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 01/19 10:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Martin Hunt on behalf of Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Set Aside
Thu 01/19 9:55 PM
MOTION to Set Aside15 Default Judgment by Ambicom Holdings, Inc..(Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Part 2 | ||
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
Judgment - Default
Tue 04/19 3:01 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of PC Drivers Headquarters, LP against Ambicom Holdings, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.(td) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 04/19 12:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART13 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
21
pgs
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 01/29 5:22 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP.(Courtney, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration of Kurt Oliver, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1 - Joint Development and License Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2 - Amendment to the JDLA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3 - Escrow Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 12 pgs Exhibit A-4 - Interserver Invoices, | ||
Att: 6 12 pgs Exhibit A-5 - DataArt Invoices, | ||
Att: 7 7 pgs Exhibit B - State Court Default, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit C - Attorneys' Fees Declaration of Marcus Brooks, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Order Proposed Final Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Proposed Final Default Judgment | ||
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 01/26 10:44 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (td) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 01/25 4:32 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Ambicom Holdings, Inc. by PC Drivers Headquarters, LP.(Schumacher, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/25 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew J. Schumacher on behalf of PC Drivers Headquarters, LP. Attorney Andrew J. Schumacher added to party PC Drivers Headquarters, LP(pty:pla) (Schumacher, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 12/17 12:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
8 | 8
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 12/17 12:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2015 re5 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)(td) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion Hearings
Wed 12/09 9:36 AM
ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for5 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion Hearing reset for 12/17/2015 at 10:00 AM (time change only) before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion Hearings
Tue 12/08 4:52 PM
ORDER Rescinding Text Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Set Motion Hearing on5 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for 12/17/2015 at 9:45 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 12/08 9:31 AM
***RESCINDED PER ORDER6 ***Text Order GRANTING5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rc) Modified on 12/8/2015 (td) |
||
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 12/04 6:32 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ambicom Holdings, Inc..(Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Withdraw | ||
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 11/17 4:07 PM
ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Tue 11/17 3:59 PM
Letter to Cathryn Berryman re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Supplement
Tue 11/17 2:56 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal JS-44 Supplement by Ambicom Holdings, Inc.. (Hunt, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 11/17 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ambicom Holdings, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-7964044), filed by Ambicom Holdings, Inc..(Hunt, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 11/17 3:52 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) |