The Gymboree Corporation
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Keith L Phillips |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-32986 |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The Gymboree Corporation
71 Stevenson Street Suite 2200
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
James A. Mesterharm
71 Stevenson Street Suite 2200
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 08, 2017 5:05 PM EDT |
Creditor
145 Great Road LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
5060 Montclair Plaza Lane Owner, LLC
1875 Century Park East, Suite 1860
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARC SWWMGPA001,LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Allen ISD
Linbarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Electric Power
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American National Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arlington ISD
500 E. Border St. Ste. 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aronov Realty Management
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aspen GRF2, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BP Prucenter Acquisition LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BP Watertown Retail, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Baltimore Gas and Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bohannon Development Company
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bohannon Development Corporation
225 West Santa Clara Street, Suite 1500
San Jose, CA 95113 |
|
Creditor
Brazoria County Tax Office, et al
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bridgewater Falls Station, LLC
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 1300 South
Washington, DC 20004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc., f/k/a Centro Properties Group
Ballard Spahr LLP 1735 Market Street, 51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixton-Rogue LLC
Bewley, Lassleben & Miller 13215 E. Penn St., Suite 510
Whittier, CA 90602 |
|
Creditor
Broadway Mall Owner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CBL & Associates Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
COROC/Westbrook I, L.L.C.
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CPBP-VII Associates, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
California Board of Accountancy
2450 Venture Oaks Way, Suite 300
Sacramento, CA 95833 |
|
Creditor
Carlyle-Cypress Tuscaloosa I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Causeway LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Centennial Real Estate Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CenterCal Properties, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Charles County, Maryland
6801 Kenilworth Ave. Suite 400
Riverdale Park, MD 20737 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chatham County Tax Commisioner
P.O. Box 8324
Savanna, GA 31412 |
|
Creditor
City Creek Center Associates LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Garland
1919 S Shiloh Rd, Ste 310, LB 40
Garland, TX 75042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Grapevine
500 E. Border St. Ste. 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Highland Village
500 E. Border St. Ste. 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Mercedes
3301 Northland Drive Suite 505
Austin, TX 78731 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of frisco
Linebarger Goggan Balir & Sampson, LLP 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of PA Dept of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance P.O. Box 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Connecticut Light and Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Credit Suisse AG, Cayman Islands Branch
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Crosspoint Realty Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Crowley ISD
500 E. Border St. Ste. 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DDR Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DLC Management Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmonos Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Delmarva Power & Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deutsche Asset & Wealth Management
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dixon Vaughn Holdings, LLC
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP 1700 Pacific Avenue Suite 4100
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dolphin Mall Associates LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Esplanade Realty, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fairfax Company of Virginia L.L.C
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Realty Investment Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Florida Power & Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Foursquare Properties, Inc.
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
G&I VI Promenade, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
G&I VII Reno Operating LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GEM Realty
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GEM Realty Capital, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
Kristen N. Pate 110 N. Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GS Pacific ER, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Galveston County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garland ISD
1919 S Shiloh Rd, Ste 310, LB 40
Garland, TX 75042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Georgia Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Grapevine-Colleyville ISD
500 E. Border St. Ste. 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Green Hills Mall TRG LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Greenberg Gibbons Commercial Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gregory Greenfield & Associates Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hines Global REIT 2615 Med Center Parkway LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hutensky Realty Group
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
IBM Corporation
|
|
Creditor
IMI Colorado Springs LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IMI Huntsville LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IMI Jefferson Pointe LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IMI Mount Pleasant LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street 7th Floor
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
JBG/Woodbridge Retail, LLC
Tenenbaum & Saas, P.C. 4504 Walsh Street, Suite 200
Chevy Chase, MD 20815 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
JLL
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jersey Central Power & Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KIR Pasadena II, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRE Colonie Owner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kahala Center Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kaufman County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kravco Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LF Centennial Pte Ltd.
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Creditor
Lane Avenue 450, LLC
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 1300 South
Washington, DC 20004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Legacy Place Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levin Management Corporation
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lewisville ISD
Linbarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lubbock Central Appraisal District
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott PO Box 817
Lubbock, TX 79408 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
MPH Pacific Place LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Market Street Retail South LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maverick County
3301 Northland Drive Suite 505
Austin, TX 78731 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Meredith Corp.
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Meredith Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Metropolitan Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri department of revenue
PO Box 475 Bankruptcy Unit
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Monongahela Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montgomery County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Joh P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
NED Little Rock LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
NStar Electric & Gas Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NWSL Town Center, LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
OWRF BAYBROOK LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OWRF Carmel, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
320 Robert S. Kerr, Room 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102 |
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St. 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PGIM Real Estate
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PREIT Services, LLC, as agent for various landlords
Kurtzman Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street, Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19147 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Palm Beach Mall Holdings LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pathlight Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Plaza Internacional Puerto Rico LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Potomac Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prince George's County, Maryland
6801 Kenilworth Ave. Suite 400
Riverdale Park, MD 20737 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Providence Town Center Limited Partnership d/b/a PTC-Providence Town Center Limited Partnership
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Public Service Company of New Hampshire
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ramco-Greshenson Properties, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regency Centers Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Retail Properties of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rich-Taubman Associates
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Riverdale Center II, L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rouse Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ST Mall Owner LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Salt River Project
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
San Diego Gas and Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
John J. Saunders
460 Runaround Pond Road
Durham, ME 04222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Susan S. Saunders
460 Runaround Pond Road
Durham, ME 04222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shopcore Properties, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shops on the Green, LLC
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 1300 South
Washington, DC 20004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Short Hills Associates, L.L.C.
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Smith County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southgate Mall Associates LLP
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
SunValley Shopping Center LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TB Mall at UTC LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TSW 2015, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TYBAB Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tampa Westshore Associates Limited Partnership
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taubman Auburn Hills Associates Limited Partnership
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taubman Landlords
Attn. Andrew S. Conway 200 E. Long Lake Road Suite 300
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taubman Prestige Outlets of Chesterfield LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taubman-Cherry Creek Shopping Center L.L.C.
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Ad Valorem Taxing Jurisdictions
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts and Texas Workforce Commission
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Chubb Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Cleveland Electric Illuminating Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Commonwealth Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The District, L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Forbes Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Gardens on El Paseo LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Macerich Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Marion Plaza, Inc. dba Eastwood Mall; Governor's Square Company dba Governor's Square; Huntington Mall Company, dba Huntington Mall; Kentucky Oaks Mall Company dba Kentucky Oaks Mall; Me
Cafaro Management Company 5577 Youngstown Warren Rd.
Niles, OH 44446 |
|
Creditor
The Potomac Electric Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Related Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Toledo Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Trademark Property Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o Kay D. Brock Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tucson Electric Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Turnberry Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Twelve Oaks Mall, LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UBS Realty Investors, LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Parcel Service, Inc.
633 Menlo Ave., Suite 100
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Creditor
Valley Square Owner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vernon Hills Shopping Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vestar DRM-OPCO, LLC
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 1300 South
Washington, DC 20004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Energy Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
W/S/M Hingham Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Warwick Mall L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Washington Prime Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Weingarten Realty Investors
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Farms Mall, LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Penn Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Western Massachusetts Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westfield, LLC and certain of its affliates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Whitestone Village Square at Dana Park LLC
4040 East Camelback Road Suite 110
Phoenix, AZ 85018 |
|
Creditor
YTC Mall Owner, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Yankee Gas Services Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
American Lebanese Syrian Associated Charities, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bain Capital Private Equity, LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Castle & Cooke Corona Crossings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Stephen Metz
Offit Kurman, P.A. 4800 Montgomery Lane, 9th Floor
Bethesda, MD 20814 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Suite 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
1. | Gymboree, a rare retailer to emerge from bankruptcy last year, unveils its reboot on Amazon Prime Day (cnbc.com) |
Submitted Tue 07/17/2018 | |
2. | Children's Apparel Retailer Plans to Close 350 Stores (fortune.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/13/2017 | |
3. | Children's clothing retailer Gymboree files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (cnbc.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/12/2017 | |