Member Case
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-32986

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:17-bk-32989
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2017
Terminated:Jan 19, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc.
71 Stevenson St Ste 2200
San Francisco, CA 94105-2979
Represented By
Michael A. Condyles
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Suite 4304
Richmond, VA 23219


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Friday, January 19, 2018
9 9 court Case Closed - Chapter 11 Fri 01/19 2:41 PM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been fully administered, the case is hereby closed. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
8 8 misc Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), List(s) - NO FEE Wed 08/02 9:36 PM
Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s) Filed: Schedule G, Schedule H, filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
7 7 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Tue 07/18 9:52 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Tue 07/18 9:50 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Schedules of Assets and Liabilities filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
5 5 order Directing Tue 06/13 3:00 PM
Order Setting an Expedited Hearing on "First Day Motions" and for Related Relief (Cummings, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2017
4 4 order Order on Motion for Joint Administration Mon 06/12 3:13 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+], Related Case 3:17-bk-32986. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Gym-Card, LLC, Case No. 17-32985 The Gymboree Corporation, Case No. 17-32986 Giraffe Intermediate B, Inc., Case No. 17-32987 Gym-Mark, Inc., Case No. 17-32988 Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc., Case No. 17-32989 Gymboree Retail Stores, Inc., Case No. 17-32990 Gymboree Operations, Inc., Case No. 17-32991 and S.C.C. Wholesale, Inc., Case No. 17-32992 The docket in Case No. 17-32986 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Cummings, James)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 motion Joint Administration Mon 06/12 12:41 AM
Motion for Joint Administration with 17-32985 17-32986 17-32987 17-32988 17-32990 17-32991 17-32992 filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc.. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 11, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 06/11 11:43 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 17-32989 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26401526, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 19 pgs misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Sun 06/11 11:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc.. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]