GenOn Energy, Inc. and NRG Clearfield Pipeline Company LLC
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-33695 |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 12, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
GenOn Energy, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Americas Generation, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Americas Procurement, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Asset Management, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Capital Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Energy Holdings, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Energy Management, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Energy Services, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Fund 2001 LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Mid-Atlantic Development, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn Northeast Management Company
1601 Bryan Street Suite 200
Dallas, TX 75201 |
|
Debtor
GenOn Power Operating Services MidWest, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
GenOn REMA Services, Inc.
1601 Bryan Street Suite 200
Dallas, TX 75201 |
|
Debtor
GenOn Special Procurement, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Hudson Valley Gas Corporation
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
MNA Finance Corp.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Mirant Asia-Pacific Ventures, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Mirant Intellectual Asset Management and Marketing, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Mirant International Investments, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Mirant New York Services, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Mirant Power Purchase, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Mirant Wrightsville Investments, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Mirant Wrightsville Management, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Americas, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Bowline LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG California North LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG California South GP LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG California South LP
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Canal LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Clearfield Pipeline Company LLC
1601 Bryan Street Suite 200
Dallas, TX 75201 |
|
Debtor
NRG Delta LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Florida GP, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Florida LP
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Lovett Development I LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Lovett LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG New York LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG North America LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Northeast Generation, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Northeast Holdings, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Potrero LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Power Generation Assets LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Power Generation LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Power Midwest GP LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Power Midwest LP
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG REMA LLC
1601 Bryan Street Suite 200
Dallas, TX 75201 |
|
Debtor
NRG Sabine (Delaware), Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Sabine (Texas), Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG San Gabriel Power Generation LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Tank Farm LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Wholesale Generation GP LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Wholesale Generation LP
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
NRG Willow Pass LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Orion Power New York GP, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Orion Power New York LP, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Orion Power New York, L.P.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Broadband, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Channelview (Delaware) LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Channelview (Texas) LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Channelview LP
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Communications, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Services Channelview LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Services Desert Basin, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Services, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Solutions East, LLC
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Trading Exchange, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RRI Energy Ventures, Inc.
804 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:40 PM CST |
Attorney
Zack Clement
1301 McKinney Suite 5100
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
515 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 900
Houston, TX 77027 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
PriceWaterHouseCoopers LLP
|
Represented By
|
Consultant
PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
300 Madison Ave.
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
121 Champion, LLC.
McGRATH McCALL, P.C. Four Gateway Center, Suite 1040 444 Liberty Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ACE American Insurance Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
2520 W.W. Thorne Drive
Houston, TX 77073 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Committee of GenOn Energy, Inc. and GenOn Americas Generation, LLC Noteholders
Porter Hedges LLP 1000 Main Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Allegheny Energy Supply Company, LLC
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Transmission Systems, Inc.
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arch Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
84 Herbert Avenue Building B Suite 202
Closter, NJ 07624 |
|
Creditor
CSX Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
California Power Exchange Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CenterPoint Energy Services, Inc.
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Centerpoint Energy MRT Services, LLC
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Citibank, N.A., as Issuing Bank
|
|
Creditor
City of Pittsburg
Felderstein Fitzgerald Willoughby et al 400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1750
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Clarence E. Buell, Jr.
3725 Topaz Ranch Drive
Wellington, NV 89444 |
|
Creditor
Cleveland Electric Illuminating Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Conemaugh Lessor Genco LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
D&S Hoist and Crane
4200 Castell Drive
Coraopolis, PA 15108 |
|
Creditor
Deutsche Bank Trust Companies Americas As Indenture Trustee
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Direct Energy LP
Edison, McDowell & Hetherington LLP c/o Joseph E. Bain 1001 Fannin Suite 2700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DuPage County Treasurer
|
|
Creditor
Eads Distribution, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
Fast Track Logistics
|
|
Creditor
Harvey Feuer
70 North Road
Berkely Heights, NJ 07922 |
|
Creditor
FirstEnergy Corp.
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GPU Energy
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GenOn Ad Hoc Group
Porter Hedges LLP 1000 Main Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GenOn Americas Generation Noteholders Steering Committee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
34 North Meramec Avenue
Clayton, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
HS Financial Group, LLC
25651 Detroit Road Suite 203
Cleveland, OH 44145 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Haas Group International LLC
400 N. Saint Paul St., Suite 510
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hain Capital Group
|
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
HydroChem LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street 7th Floor
Boston, MA 02110 |
|
Creditor
Jersey Central Power & Light Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
John P. Dillman
Harris County, Texas Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Keystone Lessor Genco LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, L.P.
10953 Vista Lake Ct
Navasota, TX 77868 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Martha K. Lisk
1441 S. Beverly Glen Blvd. Apt. 206
Los Angeles, CA 90024 |
|
Creditor
Massachusetts Department of Revenue
|
|
Creditor
Metropolitan Edison Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mississippi Department of Revenue
Legal Division Post Office Box 22828
Jackson, MS 39225 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mr John of Pittsburgh
|
|
Creditor
NRG Energy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NStar Electric & Gas Corp.
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
P O Box 5300
Albany, NY 12205 |
|
Creditor
Nol-Tec Systems Inc
555 Theordore Fremd Ave STE C209
Rye, NY 10580 |
|
Creditor
Northeastern Landscape & Lawn Care LLC
|
|
Creditor
Ohio Edison Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St. 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Orange and Rockland Utilities, Inc.
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pasadena Independent School District
4701 Preston Ave
Pasadena, TX 77505 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Peabody COALSALES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Electric Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Power Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Potomac Edison Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Potrero Power Development Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carroll R Powell
2030 Oceanbrook Dr
Wall Township, NJ 07719 |
|
Creditor
John B Powell
2030 Oceanbrook Dr
Wall Township, NJ 07719 |
|
Creditor
Primeshares
261 Fifth Avenue 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
|
Creditor
Reoganized FLI, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Reorganized FLI, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Angel Rodriguez
|
|
Creditor
Deb Secrest
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Labor and Industry Collections Support Unit 651 Boas Street Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121 |
|
Creditor
Shawville Lessor Genco LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sonar Asset Management Group, Inc.
80 Business Park Drive Suite 208
Armonk, NY 10504 |
|
Creditor
Southern California Edison Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southern California Gas Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Standard Contracting & Engineering, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Syracuse Thermal Products, Inc.
|
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
PO Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund LP
555 Theodore Fremd Avenue Suite C-209
Rye, NY 10580 |
|
Creditor
Tenaska Power Services Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC
10953 Vista Lake Ct.
Navasota, TX 77868 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Ad Valorem Taxing Jurisdictions
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The GenOn Energy, Inc. Noteholders Steering Committee
Porter Hedges LLP 1000 Main Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Midwest Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Missouri and Kansas Natural Gas Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Natural Gas Litigation Midwest Class Plaintiffs
Polsinelli PC 1000 Louisiana Street, 53rd Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Natural Gas Litigation Wisconsin Class Plaintiffs
Washington Building Barnabas Business Center 4650 North Port Washington Road
Milwaukee, WI 53212 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Toledo Edison Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Wisconsin Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tom Green County Appraisal District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Total-Western, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Union Pacific Railroad Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kathy Vaughn
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
William Vaughn
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vendor Recovery Fund IV, LLC
4 Stamford Plaza
Stamford, CT 06902 |
|
Creditor
Walker Engineering, Inc.
Baker & Hostetler LLP 811 Main Street, Suite 1100
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Penn Power Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
ROTHSCHILD INC.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gonzalez Alfonso
5778 W Rittenhouse Building north Suite 213
Houston, TX 77071 |
|
Interested Party
Alstom Power, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Behalf of Certain Pass Through Certificate Holders
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
California Air Resources Board
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
California Department of Toxic Substances Control
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
City of Oxnard, California
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of PA Department of Environmental Protection
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC
www.epiqglobal.com 757 Third Ave Third Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
|
Interested Party
Florida Department of Environmental Protection
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
General Electric International Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Governance Committee of the Board of Managers of GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP 1700 Pacific Avenue Suite 4100
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Governance Committee of the Board of Managers of NRG REMA, LLC
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP 1700 Pacific Avenue Suite 4100
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
HS Financial Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bernadette Haas Roth
|
|
Interested Party
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 97
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Tom Miller
|
|
Interested Party
Moody's Analytics, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Morgantown OL1 LLC, Morgantown OL2 LLC, Morgantown OL3 LLC, Morgantown OL4 LLC, Morgantown OL5 LLC, Morgantown OL6 LLC, Morgantown OL7 LLC, Dickerson OL1 LLC, Dickerson OL2 LLC, Dickerson OL3 LLC, and Dickerson OL4 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
NY State Dept. of Environmental Conservation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Natixis Funding Corp
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PJM Interconnection, L.L.C.
1600 Market Street, Suite 3600
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Prince George's County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TP Electric and Power, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TR Capital Management, LLC
PO BOX 633
Woodmere, NY 11598 |
|
Interested Party
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Holly Rice
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
McKinsey Recovery and Transformation Services U.S., LLC
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
1. | GenOn Energy files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (utilitydive.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/21/2017 | |